Adams v. Dolgencorp, LLC

Plaintiff: Brenda Adams
Defendant: Dolgencorp, LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv00784
Filed: November 17, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2013 123 Opinion or Order of the Court Ruling granting Defendant's 90 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/18/2013. (LLH)
June 7, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 Motion to Quash, except that the time frame of the subpoena shall be limited to three years preceding the incident at issue in this lawsuit through the present date. It is further ordered that the parties shall advise Blue Cross B lue Shield of this court's ruling in order that Blue cross Blue Shield may comply with the subpoena within 21 days of this Order. It is further ordered that within 14 days of this Order, the parties shall submit a joint motion with a proposed protective order regarding confidential information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on June 7, 2012. (SR)
May 25, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on May 25, 2012. (SR)
May 22, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 37 Motion to Quash. The non-party shall appear for deposition on May 23, 2012, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on May 22, 2012. (SR)
February 16, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 9 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge regarding the 2 Pltfs Motion to Remand. Pltfs motion to remand is denied as subject matter jurisdiction based on diversity exits over this matter. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 2/16/2012. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Dolgencorp, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Adams
Represented By: Donna Unkel Grodner
Represented By: Marcus J. Plaisance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp, LLC
Represented By: Trevor C Davies
Represented By: Kevin P. Kress
Represented By: Peter Joseph Wanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?