Keys et al v. Dean Morris, L.L.P. et al

Plaintiff: Cheryl Lynette Keys and Willie Lionel Keys
Defendant: Coldwell Banker Mackey Co,, Jamie Crane, Dean Morris, L.L.P., Family Enterprises, Inc. and Key Mortgage Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00049
Filed: January 27, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 75 Motion for Summary Judgment. All claims asserted against the Defendants, Jamie Crane and the Mackey Company, are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 06/04/2014. (CGP)
May 30, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 51 Motion for Reconsideration of 46 Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by Dean Morris, L.L.P. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 5/30/2013. (LLH)
February 20, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 5 Motion to Dismiss, converted to Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/19/2013. (LLH)
April 18, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 10 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 3 Motion to Remand filed by Willie Lionel Keys, Cheryl Lynette Keys is denied and this matter is referred back to the USMJ for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 04/18/2012. (NLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keys et al v. Dean Morris, L.L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coldwell Banker Mackey Co,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Crane
Represented By: Michael P. Bienvenu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Morris, L.L.P.
Represented By: Benjamin Bryan Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Donnie L. Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Key Mortgage Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Lynette Keys
Represented By: Kent S. DeJean
Represented By: James S. Holliday, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Lionel Keys
Represented By: Kent S. DeJean
Represented By: James S. Holliday, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?