Dill v. Ascension Parish et al

Plaintiff: Timothy Dill
Defendant: Jeffery Wiley, Ty Gauteaux, Paul Hall, Tommy Martinez, Ascension Parish, Ascension Parish Correctional Center, Michelle Gaudin, Ramond McNeil and Medical Provider for Ascension Parish Correctional Center
Case Number: 3:2012cv00083
Filed: February 13, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING approving the Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge and adopting it as the court's opinion herein. The Plaintiff's claims asserted against the Ascension Parish Correctional Center and the "Medical Provider fo r Ascension Parish Correctional Center" are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted and the 27 , 31 Motions for Summary Judgment of the remaining defendants are GRANTED dismissing the plaintiff's claims, with prejudice, and this action is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/11/2013. (LLH)
August 19, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jeffery Wiley, Ramond McNeil, Paul Hall, and 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ascension Parish, Ty Gauteaux, Michelle Gaudin, Tommy Martinez. It is re commended that the plaintiff's claims asserted against the Ascension Parish Correctional Center and the "Medical Provider for Ascension Parish Correctional Center" be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be gra nted and that the Motions for Summary Judgment of the remaining defendants, rece. doc. nos 27 and 31, be granted, dismissing the plaintiff's claims, with prejudice, and that this action be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 08/19/2013. (CGP)
August 6, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 46 Motion for Temporary Injunction. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/6/2013. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dill v. Ascension Parish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Gauteaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascension Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascension Parish Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Gaudin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramond McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Provider for Ascension Parish Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?