Miller v. Credit et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Miller
Defendant: Captain Credit and State of Louisiana
Case Number: 3:2012cv00138
Filed: March 8, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2015 140 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER denying 134 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment, or in the Alternative, Motion for New Trial or Remittitur. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 7/8/2015. (BCL)
March 18, 2015 109 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 87 Motion in Limine Regarding Comparative Fault. The 88 Motion in Limine to Suppress Testimony Evidence Regarding Inmate Witness is denied without prejudice. The 89 Motion in Limine to Suppress Testimony and Evidence is granted in part, denied in part with prejudice and denied in part without prejudice. The 74 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff, Christopher Miller's, Declaration Concerning the 1/7/2015 IME is overruled. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 03/18/2015. (BCL)
May 1, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Motion to Set Rate ; granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion Reset Scheduling Deadlines. This litigation and all related proceedings are hereby STAYED for 90 days from the date of this order. Within 90 days of t his order, defendants may submit an application for additional stay under 50 App. U.S.C. § 522(d)(1). Such application shall contain the information required under 50 App. U.S.C. § 522(b)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 5/1/2013. (LLH)
January 30, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion for an independent medical examination of plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 01/30/2013. (CGP)
September 11, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 4 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/11/12. (DCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Credit et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Credit
Represented By: Stacey Wright-Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Stacey Wright-Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Miller
Represented By: Donna Unkel Grodner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?