Gray v. Energy XXI GOM LLC et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth W Gray
Defendant: Energy XXI (Bermuda) Ltd, Energy XXI GOM LLC, Energy XXI Gulf Coast, Inc., Maritech Resources Inc, DEF Insurance Co. and ABC Insurance Co.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00165
Filed: March 22, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 08/06/2013. (NLT)
August 5, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/5/2013. (SMG)
July 10, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 45 Motion for Reconsideration and to Vacate. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 07/09/2013. (SMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Energy XXI GOM LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy XXI (Bermuda) Ltd
Represented By: Paul Durand Hale
Represented By: Bert M. Cass, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy XXI GOM LLC
Represented By: Bert M. Cass, Jr.
Represented By: Paul Durand Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy XXI Gulf Coast, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maritech Resources Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth W Gray
Represented By: David L. Bateman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?