Simoneaux et al v. E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company

Plaintiff: Jeffrey M. Simoneaux
Defendant: E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company
Interested Party: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2012cv00219
Filed: April 17, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Shelly D. Dick
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2017 342 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 333 Motion to Correct, Alter Or Amend Order and Judgment, For Relief from Order and Judgment, And For Reconsideration. This 331 Ruling on Remand is hereby amended to clarify that Plaintiff's retaliation claim remains pendin g before the Court. Any Dispositive Motions shall be filed on or before 11/15/2017. Oppositions shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion. The mover may file a reply brief, within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 10 pages. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/12/2017. (LLH)
January 20, 2016 309 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 286 Motion for Reconsideration, and the Court shall certify its 47 Ruling denying DuPont's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 1/20/2016. (LLH)
November 3, 2015 299 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 269 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's 263 RULING granting a relief from Judgment and ordering a new trial. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/2/2015. (LLH)
November 2, 2015 297 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 274 Motion to Strike. The Clerk of Court is hereby instructed to strike record document 269-16 from the record of these proceedings. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/2/2015. (LLH)
June 25, 2015 263 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 213 Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Motion for New Trial Under Rule 59, and Motion for Relief of Judgment Under Rule 60. The 241 Supplemental Motion for Relief from Judgment Under Rule 60(b)(3) and Alternatively Motion to Set Aside Judgment Under Rule 60(d)(3)62 is GRANTED on Rule 60(b)(3) grounds. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 6/25/2015. (LLH)
February 25, 2015 211 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 192 Motion MOTION to Include Language in the Judgment Preserving Relator's Rights Pursuant to 31 U.S.C. § 3730(c)(5). A separate Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 02/25/2015. (NLT)
January 13, 2015 164 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN REASONS FOR RULING denying 163 Rule 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 1/13/2015. (SMG)
December 17, 2014 129 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: In light of the Relator's burden of proof under the FCA, 93 Dupont's Motion in Limine to exclude these areas of examination and testimony on the grounds of relevance must be DENIED at this pretrial stage. This ruling is without prejudice to the rights of the parties to make evidentiary objections at trial. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/17/2014. (JDL)
November 10, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying DuPont's 53 Motion for Summary Judgment and Simoneaux's 56 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/10/2014. (LLH)
October 27, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 55 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dupont's Proposed Expert Dr. Glenn Millner. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/27/2014. (SMG)
September 2, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 48 Motion for Certification of Judgment for Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 09/02/2014. (NLT)
July 26, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 MOTION for Entry of Confidentiality and Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 07/24/2013. (NLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simoneaux et al v. E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company
Represented By: Lori A. Waters
Represented By: Monique M. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey M. Simoneaux
Represented By: Jane H. Barney
Represented By: Smith Law FIrm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States of America
Represented By: James L. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?