Bailey v. E.B.R. Parish Prison et al

Plaintiff: Gregory Bailey
Defendant: 19th Judicial District Court, E.B.R. Parish Prison, Dennis Grimes, Vincent Leggio and Tony Marabella
Case Number: 3:2012cv00224
Filed: April 17, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2015 175 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The 169 Motion for Summary Judgment of the remaining defendant in this case, Dr. Vincent Leggio, be and it is hereby GRANTED, dismissing the plaintiff's claims asserted against this defendant, with prejudice, and that this action be dismissed. Judgement shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/18/2015. (BCL)
April 24, 2015 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 159 Request for Written Depositions Motion without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 4/24/2015. (SMG)
February 9, 2015 135 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 133 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 128 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of defendant Dennis Leggio is DENIED, and this matter be referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings in connection with the plaintiffs claim asserted against Dr. Vincent Leggio. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 02/09/2015. (NLT)
September 12, 2014 130 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER adopting 121 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 107 Motion by Dr. Leggio to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 4(M) is hereby DENIED and this matter is referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/11/2014. (SMG)
May 6, 2014 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 118 Motion to Designate Rulings as Final and Appealable. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 5/6/2014. (LLH)
April 10, 2014 117 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING adopting 108 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The plaintiff's 54 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED and the 91 Motion for Summary Judgment of defendant Dennis Grimes is GRANTED, dismissing the plaintiff 9;s claims asserted against this defendant, with prejudice. This matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings in connection with the plaintiff's claim asserted against the remaining defendant, Dr. Vincent Leggio. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/10/2014. (SMG)
November 26, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 37 Motion. The plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment, rec.doc.no.37, be and it is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/26/2012. (CGP)
August 23, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Pltfs Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/22/2012. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. E.B.R. Parish Prison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 19th Judicial District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.B.R. Parish Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Leggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Marabella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?