The Shaw Group Inc et al v. Zurich American Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Shaw Process Fabricators Inc and The Shaw Group Inc
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company, Westchester Fire Insurance Company and North American Specialty Insurance Company
Counter Claimant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Unknown: Brendan Winslow-Nason and Thomas M. Jones
Notice Only: John Stephen Riper, Thomas Martin Jones, Kevin A. Michael, Jacqueline Beatty and Gregory Louis Harper
Counter Defendant: Shaw Process Fabricators Inc and The Shaw Group Inc
Case Number: 3:2012cv00257
Filed: April 30, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2014 394 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING on Motions for Summary Judgment: Zurich's 323 motion for summary judgment is DENIED. Zurich's 305 , 330 , 331 , 332 and 352 motions for partial summary judgment are DENIED. Shaw's 311 motion for partial summary jud gment is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part with respect to Zurichs responsibility for the actions of FARA. Zurich 's 346 motions to strike and 347 motion to defer ruling are MOOT. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/20/2014. (LLH)
September 3, 2014 376 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 306 Motion to Compel Production of Electronically Stored Information, filed on 7/7/2014 and granting 326 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 9/3/2014. (LLH)
July 10, 2014 307 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 298 Daubert MOTION To Exclude Testimony of J. Kay Thorne. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 07/10/2014. (NLT)
May 12, 2014 288 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 182 Motion to Enforce Order, Compel Deposition Testimony, Quash Untimely Discovery Requests, and for Sanctions. The court orders Zurich to produce complete responses, without objections or redactions, to Shaw's First Requests for Production within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 5/12/2014. (SMG)
May 7, 2014 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 259 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and 280 MOTION for Leave to Serve Excess Requests for Admission and Excess Interrogatory. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 05/07/2014. (CGP)
May 5, 2014 285 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 259 Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories; granting in part and denying in part 280 MOTION for Leave to to Serve Excess Requests for Admission and Excess Interrogatory. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 05/05/2014. (CGP) Modified on 5/5/2014 to edit text (CGP).
March 10, 2014 258 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Shaw's 202 Motion to Strike Paragraph 6 of the Declaration of Kimberly A. Griffith and 211 Motion to Strike Paragraph 4 of the Declaration of Pamela Asbury. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 3/10/2014. (SMG)
January 17, 2014 238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 220 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 01/17/2014. (CGP)
January 15, 2014 234 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 225 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 01/15/2014. (CGP)
January 8, 2014 215 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 206 Motion to Compel and denying as moot 207 Ex-Parte Motion for Expedited Hearing. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 01/08/2014. (CGP)
December 13, 2013 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiffs shall serve Westchester Fire Insurance Company with a copy of the Motion to Compel and shall file proof of service with the Court no later than 12/20/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 12/13/2013. (SMG)
July 15, 2013 159 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 150 Motion to Stay; denying 150 Motion to Bifurcate. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/12/2013. (LLH)
February 7, 2013 132 Opinion or Order of the Court Ruling on Motion for Reconsideration. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS 122 NASs motion in part and DENIES it in part, and the Court DENIES 125 Zurichs motion. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/7/2013. (LLH)
October 17, 2012 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 102 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 108 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 110 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/17/2012. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Shaw Group Inc et al v. Zurich American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas W. Darling
Represented By: Michael D. Peytavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas W. Darling
Represented By: Michael D. Peytavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Salley, Hite & Mercer LLC
Represented By: Peyton C. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Salley, Hite & Mercer LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaw Process Fabricators Inc
Represented By: Caroline H. Parenton
Represented By: Kevin Oliver Ainsworth
Represented By: Gary J. Russo
Represented By: William L. Schuette, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Shaw Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Brendan Winslow-Nason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Thomas M. Jones
Represented By: Peyton C. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: John Stephen Riper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: Thomas Martin Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: Kevin A. Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: Jacqueline Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: Gregory Louis Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Shaw Process Fabricators Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: The Shaw Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?