Hood v. Page et al

Plaintiff: Carey Louis Hood
Defendant: N. Burl Cain and Dorthy Page
Case Number: 3:2012cv00287
Filed: May 15, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 75 Motion for Reconsideration of the 74 Order Revoking In Forma Pauperis status. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/18/2013. (JDL)
June 3, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 51 Motion to Suppress Plaintiff's Original Deposition Transcripts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 06/03/2013. (CGP)
February 20, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION: The defendant's motion for partial summary judgment is hereby granted in part and denied in part, dismissing all of plaintiff's claims against Warden Burl Cain and Lt. Dorothy Page except for plaintiff's retaliation claim against Lt. Dorothy Page. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 02/19/2013. (CGP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hood v. Page et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorthy Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carey Louis Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?