Medecor Pharma, L.L.C. et al v. Fleming and Company, Pharmaceuticals

Plaintiff: Medecor Pharma, L.L.C. and Bradley Sanders
Defendant: Fleming Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00291
Filed: May 17, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2014 118 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The Court (1) DENIES the Defendant's 107 Motion for Reconsideration; (2) GRANTS IN PART the Defendant's 108 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding Plaintiffs' Dismissed Claim; (3) DENIES the Defendant's Motion 109 in Limine to Exclude Any Undisclosed Damages Claims; and (4) GRANTS the Plaintiffs' Motion 111 in Limine. Furthermore, the Court defers ruling on the Defendants Motion 110 in Limine to Exclude Argument that the Term Sheet was Covered by the Non-Disclosure Agreement until the trial on the merits. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 08/06/2014. (NLT)
April 24, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 64 , 65 and 68 Motions in Limine. The Clerk of Court's Office shall terminate document 66, as it is a duplicate of document 68. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/23/2014. (LLH)
April 1, 2014 104 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 97 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Defendant Fleming and Company, Pharmaceuticals'. The Clerk of Court shall terminate 96 Motion, as it is a duplicate of document 97. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/1/2014. (LLH)
February 3, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 90 Motion for Reconsideration of 88 Order Granting Partial Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, to Certify the Orders for Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/3/2014. (LLH)
January 6, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 62 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying Plaintiff's 63 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/6/2014. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medecor Pharma, L.L.C. et al v. Fleming and Company, Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fleming Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Christine Lipsey
Represented By: Mark Leadlove
Represented By: Brook L. Thibodeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medecor Pharma, L.L.C.
Represented By: Chad A. Dudley
Represented By: William Paul Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Sanders
Represented By: Chad A. Dudley
Represented By: William Paul Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?