Brauner v. Coody et al

Plaintiff: Francis Brauner
Defendant: Kim Unknown, Megan Unknown, Melinda Unknown, Rose Unknown, Jason Collins, Shirley Coody, Sharon Dunbar, Unknown McMurdo, Kenneth Norris, Unknown Pruit, Tammy Unknown, Gina Unknown, Chuck Unknown and Jonathan Roundtree
Case Number: 3:2012cv00314
Filed: May 29, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2014 113 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 102 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge; ORDERED that defendants' 70 motion for summary judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's 72 cross motion for summary judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's 77 and 81 motions for a preliminary injunction and/or restraining order and plaintiff's 78 and 82 motions to dispense with the requirement of security are DENIED. Signed by Judge Lance M. Africk on 5/29/2014. (BLG) Modified on 5/29/2014 (BLG).
February 13, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 56 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the 41 partial motion to dismiss by defendants, Tammy Jack, Sherwood Poret, Dr. Randy Lavesphere, and Kym Plylar is DENIED. Signed by Judge Lance M. Africk on 2/12/2014. (BLG)
February 28, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING approving 29 Report and Recommendation of the magistrate judge; denying 22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 02/27/2013. (CGP)
December 5, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 14 pltfs Request for Summons treated as a Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and to Issue Trial Subpoenas. IT IS ORDERED that Rosie Washington, Chuck Dugas, Kim Plylar, Megan Ruffin, Melinda Thomas, Tammy Jack and Sherwood Poret b e substituted for the defts previously identified as Rose, Chuck, Kim, Megan, Melinda, Tammy, Gina and Pruit. FURTHER ORDERED that the defts be served with the original and amended complaints. FURTHER ORDERED that the USM serve the defts wherever found. FURTHER ORDERED that pltfs motion to issue trial subpoenas is denied as premature. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/5/2012. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brauner v. Coody et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Coody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Dunbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown McMurdo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Pruit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Roundtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Brauner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?