Scott v. Poret

Plaintiff: Derrick Scott
Defendant: Unknown Richardson, Terry Poret, Trish Foster and Unknown Irvin
Case Number: 3:2012cv00346
Filed: June 8, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The above-captioned proceeding be dismissed, without prejudice, for failure of the plaintiff to pay the Court's filing fee. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/28/2014. (SMG)
January 16, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating 5 Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Plaintiff's 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby DENIED. The plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of this Order within which to pay $350, the full amount of the Court's filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 1/16/2014. (SMG)
October 18, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 14 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge and this action is DISMISSED, without prejudice, as a result of the pltfs failure to exhaust administrative remedies as mandated by 42 USC 1997e, but with prejudice to his refiling the same claim or claims in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/17/2012. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Poret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Poret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trish Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?