Lavigne v. Cajun Deep Foundations, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Terrance J. Lavigne
Defendant: Cajun Deep Foundations, LLC and Cajun Industries, LLC
Case Number: 3:2012cv00441
Filed: July 24, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2015 133 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER: Because the Court now vacates its prior ruling awarding Lavigne damages, consideration of Lavigne's motion regarding emotional damages is no longer necessary. The 123 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. The 124 Motion for Reconsideration of the 2/4/2015 122 Ruling and Order is GRANTED. This Court's 122 Ruling and Order of 2/4/2015 is VACATED IN PART. JUDGMENT is hereby rendered IN FAVOR OF Defendant Cajun Deep Foundations, LLC and AGAINST Plaintiff Terrance J. Lavigne. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 7/17/215. (BCL)
February 4, 2015 122 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER: Plaintiff's request for a judgment in his favor, injunctive relief, compensatory damages, and attorneys' fees and costs is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. All parties shall file memoranda regarding the issue of damages , attorney's fees, and costs, including evidence of prevailing wages and all other relevant considerations, in light of this ruling, on or before 3/04/2015. All motions shall comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 02/04/2014. (BCL)
July 10, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion for Summary Judgment by Cajun Deep Foundations LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 07/10/2014. (NLT)
February 28, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 02/28/2014. (NLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lavigne v. Cajun Deep Foundations, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cajun Deep Foundations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cajun Industries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance J. Lavigne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?