Cripps et al v. State of Louisiana Department of Agriculture and Forestry

Plaintiff: Michael Anthony Cripps, David Fields and John David Cripps
Defendant: State of Louisiana Department of Agriculture and Forestry
Case Number: 3:2012cv00452
Filed: July 30, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 75 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on State Law Claims. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/7/2014. (LLH)
June 3, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting Defendants' 43 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and denying Plaintiff Willie Cripps' 44 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/3/2014. (LLH)
December 7, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Granting in part and Denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss. The Defendants qualified immunity claim is GRANTED with respect to any procedural due process claims but DENIED with respect to any substantive due process claims. Additionally, Plaintiffs are advised to file a motion to amend their complaint to include an Eighth Amendment claim(s). Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 12/6/2012. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cripps et al v. State of Louisiana Department of Agriculture and Forestry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Anthony Cripps
Represented By: Smith Law FIrm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Fields
Represented By: Douglas Gist Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John David Cripps
Represented By: Smith Law FIrm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana Department of Agriculture and Forestry
Represented By: Douglas Gist Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?