Bonner et al v. Kellogg Brown and Root et al

Plaintiff: Terry Bonner, Lawrence Isaac, Jr., Jarred Kirk, Ricky C Murphy, Lyndon Garnett O'Dneal, Elizah L Pierson and Jermaine M Williams
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific, LLC and Kellogg, Brown, & Root, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00456
Filed: July 31, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting 77 Motion to Dismiss Claims of Remaining Plaintiffs. The action is hereby DISMISSED, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 01/10/2014. (CGP)
October 31, 2013 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 70 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses. Plaintiffs Terry Bonner, Elizah Pierson, Jared Kirk, and Ricky Murphy shall produce complete responses to GPs Interrogatories and Requests for Production written discovery on or before 11/12/2013. Plaintiff Lyndon Garnett ODneal must submit complete responses to GPs Interrogatory Nos. 4, 5, 6, 8, 9, and 16 and Requests for Production Nos. 1, 2, 4, 5, and 7 as outlined above on or before 11/12/2013. Plaintiff Jermaine M. Williams must submit complete responses to GPs Interrogatory No. 13 and Requests for Production No. 6 as outlined above on or before 11/12/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 10/31/2013. (CGP)
September 4, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 61 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the claims of Plaintiff, Lawrence Isaac, Jr., are dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.2 and Rule 41(b), for failure to prosecute. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 9/4/2013. (SMG)
June 7, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Kellogg, Brown & Root, Inc. Plaintiffs' claims against Kellogg, Brown & Root, Inc. are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 6/6/2013. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonner et al v. Kellogg Brown and Root et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Bonner
Represented By: J. Price McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Isaac, Jr.
Represented By: J. Price McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarred Kirk
Represented By: J. Price McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky C Murphy
Represented By: J. Price McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyndon Garnett O'Dneal
Represented By: J. Price McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizah L Pierson
Represented By: J. Price McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermaine M Williams
Represented By: J. Price McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg, Brown, & Root, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?