Delahoussaye et al v. Livingston Parish, Louisiana et al

Plaintiff: C-Del, Inc. and Corey Delahoussaye
Defendant: Alvin Fairburn and Associates, International Equipment Distributors, Inc., Livingston Parish, Louisiana, Professional Engineering Consultants Corporation and Luther Layton Ricks, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00481
Filed: August 9, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2015 87 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying as moot 79 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 3/3/2015. (LLH)
September 11, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted.The Defendants Motion to Dismiss the state law whistleblower claims arising under La. R.S. 23:967 and La. R.S. 42:1169 is GRANTED, and the Plaintiffs claims for violations of La. R.S. 23:967 and La. R.S. 42:1169 are hereby dismissed with prejudice. The Defendants Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiffs 42 U.S.C. § 1983 claims arising under the First and Fourteenth A mendments is hereby DENIED.The Defendant Parish President Luther Layton Ricks Motion to Dismiss on the basis of qualified immunity is hereby GRANTED, and the Plaintiffs individual capacity claims against Luther Layton Ricks arising under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 9/11/2014. (LLH)
December 4, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 51 Motion Entry of Rule 54 Judgment, 53 Motion for Entry of Final Judgment and 55 Motion for Entry of Final Judgment. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/4/2013. (LLH)
August 30, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING on Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' remaining claims against Defendants, Alvin Fairburn and Associates, Professional Engineering Consultants Corporation, and International Equipment Distributors, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED, and all remaining pending motions shall be DISMISSED as MOOT. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 8/302013. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delahoussaye et al v. Livingston Parish, Louisiana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin Fairburn and Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Equipment Distributors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Livingston Parish, Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Engineering Consultants Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luther Layton Ricks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C-Del, Inc.
Represented By: Jill L. Craft
Represented By: Crystal LaFleur
Represented By: Amanda E. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Delahoussaye
Represented By: Jill L. Craft
Represented By: Crystal LaFleur
Represented By: Amanda E. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?