DiLeo v. Lane et al

Plaintiff: Marc DiLeo
Defendant: Chubb Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Gerry Lane Buick-Pontiac-GMC, LLC, Gerry Lane Enterprises, Inc and Gerald Lane
Case Number: 3:2012cv00522
Filed: August 24, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting 56 Defendants Gerry Lane Enterprises, Inc. and the Succession of Gerald R. Lane's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff Marc DiLeo's claims against Defendants Gerry Lane Enterprises, Inc. and Eric Lane are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 09/23/2014. (CGP)
September 8, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. DiLeo's request that the Court preclude Defendants from asserting the Faragher/Ellerth defense in an attempt to avoid liability for Gerald R. Lane&# 039;s acts is GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendants are PRECLUDED from asserting the Faragher/Ellerth defense in response to DiLeo's allegations regarding the acts of Gerald R. Lane. DiLeo's request that the Court preclude Defendants from asserting the Faragher/Ellerth defense in an attempt to avoid liability for the acts of other employees is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 09/08/2014. (NLT)
September 25, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 38 Motion to Quash Subpoena, defendants' subpoena issued to AT&T Mobility LLC is quashed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/22/2013. (LLH)
August 28, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER denying 15 Motion to Consolidate Cases, without prejudice to DiLeos right to refile the motion once discovery is complete and the Court has ruled on any impending dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/27/2013. (SMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiLeo v. Lane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy H. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Tony Clayton
Represented By: Timothy H. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerry Lane Buick-Pontiac-GMC, LLC
Represented By: Tony Clayton
Represented By: Timothy H. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerry Lane Enterprises, Inc
Represented By: Tony Clayton
Represented By: Timothy H. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Lane
Represented By: Tony Clayton
Represented By: Timothy H. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc DiLeo
Represented By: Jean-Paul Robert, Sr.
Represented By: Joseph Jerome Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?