James v. Lane et al

Plaintiff: Timothy James
Defendant: Gerry Lane Buick-Pontiac-GMC, LLC, Gerry Lane Enterprises, Inc, Gerald Lane, Chubb Insurance Company and Federal Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2012cv00523
Filed: August 24, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2014 97 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 64 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss Jamess claim under La. R.S. § 23:631 is GRANTED. Defendants' request that the Court d ismiss James's federal and state law discrimination claims against Gerald R. Lane, or any other individual supervisor or fellow employee, is GRANTED. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss James's claim that he was subjected to a hostile work environment claim on the basis of his sex is GRANTED. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss James's hostile work environment claim on the basis of his race is GRANTED. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss Jame s's hostile work environment claim on the basis of his national origin is GRANTED. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss James's retaliation claim is GRANTED. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss James's construc tive discharge claim is GRANTED. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss James's assault claim is GRANTED. Defendants' request that the Court dismiss Jamess intentional infliction of emotional distress claim is GRANTED. IT IS FUR THER ORDERED that James's battery claim is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and that this matter is REMANDED to the Nineteenth Judicial District Court, Parish of Baton Rouge, State of Louisiana for consideration of Jamess remaining state law claim. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 09/25/2014. (CGP) Modified on 9/26/2014 to edit text (CGP).
September 16, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. James' request that the Court preclude Defendants from asserting the Faragher/ Ellerth defense in an attempt to avoid liability for Gerald R. Lane& #039;s acts is GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendants are PRECLUDED from asserting the Faragher/ Ellerth defense in response to James' allegations regarding the acts of Gerald R. Lane. James' request that the Court preclude Defendants from asserting the Faragher/Ellert defense in an attempt to avoid liability for the acts of other employees is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/15/2014. (LLH)
August 28, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER denying 15 Motion to Consolidate Cases, without prejudice to Jamess right to refile the motion once discovery is complete and the Court has ruled on any impending dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/27/2013. (SMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Lane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerry Lane Buick-Pontiac-GMC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerry Lane Enterprises, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy James
Represented By: Joseph Jerome Long
Represented By: Jean-Paul Robert, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?