Hall et al v. State of Louisiana et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth Hall
Defendant: Baton Rouge City Court, James D Buddy Caldwell, City of Baton Rouge, Piyush Jindal, Parish of East Baton Rouge, Tom Schedler and State of Louisiana
Case Number: 3:2012cv00657
Filed: October 18, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Magistrate Judge Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2015 573 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING And ORDER denying 563 Motion to Vacate Judgment filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Hall and Intervenor-Plaintiff Byron Sharper. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/24/2015. (LLH)
June 9, 2015 562 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING, ORDER, AND JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that JUDGMENT is hereby rendered IN FAVOR OF Defendants State of Louisiana, Piyush "Bobby" Jindal, James D. "Buddy" Caldwell, Tom Schedler, the City o f Baton Rouge, Parish of East Baton Rouge, and Melvin "Kip" Holden and AGAINST Plaintiff Kenneth Hall and Plaintiff-Intervenor Byron Sharper as to alleged violations of Section 2 of the Voting Rights Act, the Fourteenth and Fifte enth Amendments to the U.S. Constitution, and 42 U.S.C. §§ 1983, 1986. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' requests for declaratory and injunctive relief pursuant to Voting Rights Act Section 2 and Section 3(c) are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' requests for attorney's fees, expert's fees, and costs are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' request for attorney's fees in the instance of their prevailing is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 6/9/2015. (JDL)
March 31, 2015 558 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 533 Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 52(c). Plaintiff's claims of abridgment of the fundamental right to vote and denial of due process under the Fourteenth Amendment, as well as plaintiff's § 1983 claim, against Defendant Schedler are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/31/2015. (LLH)
March 30, 2015 557 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 206 Motion to Certify Case as a Class Action. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 03/30/2015. (BCL)
March 23, 2015 556 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER: The 287 Plaintiff and Intervenor's Request for Judicial Notice as to Judicial and Legislative Findings of Ongoing Racial Discrimination in Voting in Louisiana is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, consistent with the rulings herein. The 337 Plaintiff and Intervenor's Request for Judicial Notice as to United States Census Bureau Data, Scholarly Publications, News Publications, Louisiana Attorney General Opinions and the Louisiana Constitution of 1974 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, consistent with the rulings herein. The 341 Plaintiff and Intervenor's Request for Judicial Notice is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 03/23/2015. (BCL)
July 30, 2014 474 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying in part and granting in part Defendant Tom Schedler's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Action by Plaintiff, Kenneth Hall [Doc. 290]; granting in part and denying in part Defendant Tom Schedler 9;s Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Action by Plaintiff-Intervenor, Byron Sharper [Doc. 291]; denying Defendant Tom Schedler's Motion to Strike Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. 323]; and denying Defendant Tom Schedler's Motion to Strike Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. 324]. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 7/30/2014. (PJH)
July 29, 2014 460 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying Plaintiff Kenneth Hall and Intervenor Plaintiff Byron Sharper's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 288 and denying Defendants' Motion to Strike Evidence Attached to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment 311 . Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 07/28/2014. (CGP)
June 6, 2014 301 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 283 Motion to Strike Expert and Expert Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 06/06/2014. (NLT)
April 23, 2014 277 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 220 , 222 Motion to Quash the Deposition Subpoena and Subpoena to Produce Documents; granting in part and denying in part 223 Motion to Quash the Deposition Subpoenas and Subpoenas to Produce Documents and granting in part and den ying in part 227 Motion to Quash Nonparty Deposition Subpoenas and Subpoenas to Produce Documents. Discovery regarding the categories of documents referenced in 223 , is permitted and must be produced by 05/07/2014, but denied as to material that remain shielded by privilege as well as the subpoenaed depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 04/23/2014. (CGP)
April 14, 2014 240 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 190 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaints. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 4/14/2014. (SMG)
April 7, 2014 218 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 184 Motion for Reconsideration of 174 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 04/07/2014. (CGP) Modified on 4/7/2014 to exit text (CGP).
March 31, 2014 215 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 136 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 03/31/2014. (NLT)
March 25, 2014 213 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 185 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 03/25/2014. (CGP)
September 30, 2013 178 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting Defendant Louisiana Legislature's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) [Doc. 100]. Plaintiff Kenneth Hall's claims against the Louisiana House of Representatives, by and throug h Charles "Chuck" Kleckley, in his official capacity as Speaker of the Louisiana House of Representatives, and Walt Leger, III, in his official capacity as Speaker Pro Tempore of the Louisiana House of Representatives, and the Louisiana Sen ate, by and through John Alario, Jr., in his official capacity as President of the Louisiana Senate, and Sharon Weston Broom, in her official capacity as President Pro Tempore of the Louisiana Senate are DISMISSED, with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/30/2013. (PJH) Modified on 9/30/2013 (PJH).
September 27, 2013 173 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER dismissing Plaintiff Kenneth Hall and Intervenor-Plaintiff Byron Sharper's claims under Section 5 of the Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended, 42 U.S.C. § 1973c, WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Hall's right to request leave of C ourt to re-urge such claims should the United States Congress pass into law a new coverage formula that includes the State of Louisiana, the Parish of East Baton Rouge, or the City of Baton Rouge as a covered jurisdiction; denying as MOOT Plaintiff K enneth Hall's Application for a Three-Judge Court (Doc. 71 ); and denying as MOOT Plaintiff Hall's Motion for Preliminary Injunction to Enforce Section 5 of the 1965 Voting Rights Act (Doc. 102 ). Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/27/2013. (SMG) Modified to edit links on 9/27/2013 (SMG). Modified to edit text on 9/27/2013 (SMG).
September 19, 2013 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 58 Motion to Certify Case As A Class Action to re-file the motion after the Court has issued rulings on the pending dispositive motions, if necessary. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 09/19/2013. (NLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall et al v. State of Louisiana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baton Rouge City Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D Buddy Caldwell
Represented By: Patricia Hill Wilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Baton Rouge
Represented By: Christina Berthelot Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piyush Jindal
Represented By: Patricia Hill Wilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parish of East Baton Rouge
Represented By: Christina Berthelot Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Schedler
Represented By: Grant Joseph Guillot
Represented By: Edmond Wade Shows
Represented By: John Carroll Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Patricia Hill Wilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Hall
Represented By: Stephen M. Irving
Represented By: Ronald Ray Johnson
Represented By: Joel Gerard Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?