Schilling v. Louisiana Department of Transportation and Development

Plaintiff: Judy Schilling
Defendant: Louisiana Department of Transportation and Development
Case Number: 3:2012cv00661
Filed: October 19, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Magistrate Judge Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2015 115 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING denying 114 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis and Directing Preparation of Transcript. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 1/5/2015. (SMG)
October 30, 2014 112 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 109 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment, or in the Alternative, Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/29/2014. (NLT)
August 4, 2014 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND RULING granting 83 Motion for Reconsideration re 80 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court hereby amends its Ruling to the extent that it erroneously stated that D.C. Carter had not been designated as an expert. H owever aside from this error and for those reasons stated herein, the Court finds that its Ruling is correct and Schilling's claim that DOTD'S failure to provide her with reasonable accommodations caused her health to worsen was properly dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 8/4/2014. (LLH)
July 28, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and granting 22 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Schillings claims of intentional infliction of emotional distress, disability-based workplace harassment/ hostile work environment arising under the ADA and LEDL, and retaliation claims arising under the ADA are hereby dismissed with prejudice in favor of DOTD As to DOTDs first Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, the motion is GRANTED as to the presc ription of Schillings claims for failure to accommodate arisingout of her April 2008 request for a modified work schedule and failure to engage in theinteractive process; Schillings claim for failure to accommodate her four (4) ten (10)hour schedule request; Schillings claim for punitive damages; and Schillings claim that DOTDs failure to provide her with reasonable accommodations caused her health to worsen. Accordingly, these claims shall be dismissed with prejudice in favor of DOTD. DOTDs f irst Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED as to Schillings qualification as an individual with a disability, and as to Schillings claims for failure to accommodate and failure to engage in the interactive process arising out of her requests for a handicapped parking spot, to wear slipper-like shoes to work, and for the re installation of a door to her office. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/28/2014. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schilling v. Louisiana Department of Transportation and Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Department of Transportation and Development
Represented By: Margaret A. Crawford Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Schilling
Represented By: Smith Law FIrm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?