U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission v. Commonwealth Advisors, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Commonwealth Advisors, Inc. and Walter A. Morales
Case Number: 3:2012cv00700
Filed: November 8, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2017 302 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 299 Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony of Edwin Witham. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 7/24/2017. (EDC)
January 11, 2017 274 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 267 Objection to Expert Report of Edwin Witham and Renewed Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 1/11/2017. (LLH)
April 6, 2016 194 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Considered in light of this case's full record, including the Defendants' multiple chances to provide a privilege log sufficient to satisfy Rule 26(b)(5), the Second Ruling contains neither clear error nor a law's misapplicati on. In the absence of such a demonstration, no reconsideration of this Court's own order so finding is merited pursuant to well-established jurisprudence. Accordingly, this Court orders as follows: (1) The Motion to Amend is DENIED to the extent that it seeks reversal of this Court order affirming the Magistrate Judge's Second Ruling on the basis of the incorrect application of the controlling standard of review. (2) Nonetheless, as the SEC has already stated, (Doc. 175 at 2; see also Doc. 174 at 4), and as Defendants themselves request as a form of alternative relief, (Doc. 131 at 4), the Defendants are not now required to produce attorney-client documents produced since the initiation of this litigation. (3) On or before 11:59 a .m., on April 14, 2016, the Defendants must produce every document required by each and every order issued by this Court and the Magistrate Judge. (4) This production will not be stayed, subject to a convincing showing of extraordinary circumstances, in light of the conduct of these Defendants and the abundant case lawsupporting the waiver of their privilege. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 4/6/2016. (BLR)
September 29, 2015 132 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 75 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/29/2015. (LLH)
November 6, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 57 Motion for In Camera Review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 11/6/2014. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission v. Commonwealth Advisors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Advisors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter A. Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: John Joseph Gaupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?