Miller v. Cain et al

Plaintiff: Shon D. Miller, Sr.
Defendant: Donald Barr, N. Burl Cain, Jason Collins, Shirley Coody, Bruce Dodd, Bobby Jindal, James Leblanc, Hal McMurdo, Jonathan Roundtree, Raman Singh and Kenneth Norris
Case Number: 3:2012cv00730
Filed: November 19, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2015 80 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 78 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Plaintiff's 68 Motion for Summary Judgment shall be denied, the defendants' 57 Motion for Summary Judgment shall be granted, and this action shall be dismissed without prejudice to any state law claim. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 01/20/2015. (BCL)
June 19, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion to Compel Discovery- Post FRCP Rule 37(a)(1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 06/19/2014. (NLT)
April 3, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING approving the 63 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge and adopting it as the Court's opinion herein. The Plaintiff's 54 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/3/2014. (LLH)
October 8, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 30 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the defendants Motion to Dismiss In Response to Amended Complaint is DENIED. Further, the court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the plaintiffs state law claims and those claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. This matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/8/2013. (JDL)
March 11, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Pltfs 14 Motion and Order for Consolidation of Cases for Trial on the Merits is denied. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/11/2013. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Coody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Jindal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Leblanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hal McMurdo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Roundtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raman Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shon D. Miller, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?