Pea v. Cain et al

Plaintiff: Donald Pea
Defendant: Burl Cain, Geoffery Crosby, Unknown Feasei, Unknown Frye, Joe Lamartiniere, Troy Poret, Greg Templeton, Darry Vanoy and Unknown Whitaker
Case Number: 3:2012cv00779
Filed: December 11, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Magistrate Judge Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2016 97 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying as moot 95 Motion Motion for Transcript of Jury Trial and Leave of Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/21/2016. (LLH)
July 13, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 53 Motion for Issuance of Temporary Restraining Order against Defendant Greg Templeton at Camp-C. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 07/13/2015. (BCL)
January 23, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING adopting 27 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 22 Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendant Greg Templeton is granted in part, dismissing all of the Plaintiff's claims asserted against the Defendant except the Plaintiff's claim for monetary damages asserted against the Defendant in the Defendant's individual capacity arising out of the alleged use of excessive force 9/11/2011. This matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 1/23/2014. (SMG)
January 2, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Complaint filed by Donald Pea. It is recommended that the Court decline the exercise of supplemental jurisdiction over the plaintiffs state law claims. It is further recommended that the Motion for Summary Judgment of defendant Greg Templeton (Rec. Doc. 22) be granted in part, dismissing all of the plaintiffs claims asserted against the defendant except the plaintiffs claim for monetary damages asserted against the defendant in the defendants in dividual capacity arising out of the alleged use of excessive force on 09/11/2011, and that this matter be referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 1/21/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 01/02/2014. (CGP) Modified on 1/2/2014 to edit text(CGP).
July 10, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, Plaintiff's claims asserted against Defendants, Sgt. R. Frye and Capt. Feisel (or Feasel), are dismissed for failure of the Plaintiff to serve these Defenda nts within 120 days as mandated by Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Further, the Motion 9 First MOTION for Summary Judgment failure to exhaust filed by Greg Templeton, Burl Cain, Joe Lamartiniere, Darry Vanoy, G eoffery Crosby, Unknown Whitaker, Troy Poret is GRANTED, dismissing claims asserted against these Defendants, without prejudice, for failure of the Plaintiff toexhaust administrative remedies as mandated by 42 U.S.C. § 1997e, but with pre judice to reassertion. of the same claim or claims against these Defendants in forma pauperis.This matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings in connection with the Plaintiff's claim of excessive force asserted against Defendant, Greg Templeton. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/10/2013. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pea v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffery Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Feasei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Frye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Lamartiniere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Poret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Templeton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darry Vanoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Pea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?