Hoffman v. Jindal et al

Plaintiff: Jessie Hoffman
Defendant: Burl Cain, John Does, Bobby Jindal, James M. LeBlanc, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections and Angie Norwood
Case Number: 3:2012cv00796
Filed: December 20, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2016 201 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting 198 , 199 , and 200 Unopposed Motions to Intervene. The Petitions of Intervention filed by Todd Wessinger, Daniel Irish, and Shedran wiliams shall be filed into the record in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/29/2016. (LLH)
March 5, 2014 143 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 124 Motion for Protective Order and denying 125 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Unredacted Responses to Discovery Requests Under Seal. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 03/05/2014. (NLT)
February 3, 2014 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Considering the Motion for Stay of Execution, a Temporary Restraining Order, a Preliminary Injunction, and an Order Under the All Writs Act Staying His Execution. It is ORDERED that the Temporary Restraining Order be issued in this matter, the reby restraining, enjoining, and prohibiting Defendants, their officers, agents, employees, servants, attorneys, and all persons in active concert or participation with them, from executing Plaintiff, CHRISTOPHER SEPULVADO, per the 01/06/2014 Amended Warrant of Execution in Capital Case, for a period of 90 days or through05/04/2014, which will not require renewal by either party until such date; or until such time as this Court shall rule on the merits of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, if it should be sooner than that date. Trial of Christopher Sepulvado's Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall begin on 04/07/2014 and shall last no more than 2 weeks. This Order is without prejudice to the rights of any party to seek from the Court the modification of this Order. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 02/03/2014. (NLT)
January 10, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 70 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 01/10/2014. (CGP)
June 4, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 60 Motion for Protective Order Pursuant to FRCP 26(a). Defendants shall provide the Protocols to the plaintiffs within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 6/4/2013. (LLH)
April 16, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 Motion to Dismiss ; denying 42 Motion to Dismiss. Accordingly, the Court finds that Hoffman and Sepulvados claims should be permitted to proceed as to all the named Defendants with the exception of Governor Jindal and DPSC. Additionally, Hoffman and Sepulvado are not entitled to seek monetary damages absent a showing of prior physical injury. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/16/2013. (LLH)
February 7, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL REASONS for granting 14 Intervenor's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Sepulvado's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 14) is GRANTED based on his due process claim. The execution is hereby STAYED pending further orders of this Court. Discovery will proceed as ordered by the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/7/2013. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoffman v. Jindal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Jindal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie Norwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Hoffman
Represented By: Mercedes Hardy Montagnes
Represented By: Michael D. Rubenstein
Represented By: Cecelia Trenticosta Kappel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?