Herster et al v. Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University et al

Plaintiff: Margaret Herster and Scott Sullivan
Defendant: Kimberly Arp, Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University, Ken Carpenter, A. G. Monaco, Jennifer Normand, Rod Parker and Mimi Ruebsamen
Case Number: 3:2013cv00139
Filed: March 6, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2017 258 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying Plaintiff's 232 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/27/2017. (LLH)
November 22, 2016 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER WITH REASONS: Margaret Hersters FMLA retaliation claims asserted against A.G. Monaco, Jennifer Normand, and Mimi Ruebsamen, in their individual capacities, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Margaret Herster and Scott Sullivans spoliation claims are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/21/2016. (LLH)
September 15, 2015 154 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 107 Motion in Limine in its entirety, GRANTING in part, DENYING in part, and DEFERRING in part 108 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/15/2015. (LLH)
December 8, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING : The plaintiff's 54 motion for partial summary judgment is DENIED, the School of Art Defendant's 62 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED, the HRM Defendant's 60 motion for summary judgment is DENIED with respect to retaliation under the FMLA and GRANTED in all other respects, and LSU's 61 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in part with respect to FMLA retaliation, the Equal Pay Act, and the Title VII sex discrimination claim regarding the hiring of Ostrenko for the tenure-track position and DENIED in part with respect to Title VII claims concerning harassment, disparate pay, and events being outside the scope of the charge, Louisiana employment discrimination claims, spoliation, and claims under the Louisiana Whistleblower Act. Plaintiff Herster's 93 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply is DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 12/8/2014. (LLH)
June 3, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with respect to the claims for intentional infliction of emotional distress and defamation, but DENIES the remainder of the motion. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/3/2013. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herster et al v. Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Arp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University
Represented By: Amy L. McInnis
Represented By: Edmond Wade Shows
Represented By: Jacqueline B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. G. Monaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Normand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rod Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mimi Ruebsamen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Herster
Represented By: Gary W. Bizal
Represented By: Elizabeth Cumming
Represented By: Stephen Haedicke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Sullivan
Represented By: Gary W. Bizal
Represented By: Elizabeth Cumming
Represented By: Stephen Haedicke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?