Dixon v. Greyhound Lines, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Edward D Dixon
Defendant: Greyhound Lines, Inc., GLI Corporate Risk Solutions and FirstGroup America
Case Number: 3:2013cv00179
Filed: March 19, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Richard L. Bourgeois
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting in part 51 Motion for Sanctions as it relates to an award of fees and expenses and DENIED as to any other award of sanctions. Plaintiff's counsel shall pay to Defendant $777.40 to be paid within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 12/22/2014. (LLH)
November 19, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 48 Motion to Compel and granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines. The 49 Motion to Extend is GRANTED in part to the extent Plaintiff seeks a modification of the Daubert motion deadline only. The parties have until 7 days following the deposition of Dr. Warner to file any Daubert motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 11/19/2014. (LLH)
November 13, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 43 Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 11/13/2014. (LLH)
October 2, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The 51 Motion to Quash and request for expedited consideration is hereby GRANTED. Any request for documents and any deposition notice that goes beyond the deposition of Mr. Smith will not be permitted. The deposition of Mr. Smith may proceed on 10/3/2014 as scheduled.The motion also requests that sanctions be ordered against plaintiff. To the extent that sanctions may be appropriate or permissible under Rule 26 and/or Rule 37 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, imposition of sanc tions requires an opportunity to be heard. Defendants are ORDERED to file an affidavit of reasonable expenses incurred in bringing this Motion, including attorneys fees setting forth time and hourly rate, no later than 10/6/2014. Plaintiff's shall file a response, if desired, not later than 10/10/2014, regarding the imposition of sanctions, including whether the plaintiffs position was substantially justified or the imposition of sanctions would be unjust. Plaintiffs response may also address whether Defendants affidavit of expenses is reasonable. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 10/2/2014. (LLH)
September 16, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs claims that Defendants were negligent by violating Greyhounds corporate policies and by failing to evacuate the bus is DENIED; Plaintiffs remaining claims of negligence against all Defendants are DISMISSED; Plaintiffs claims against GLI Corporate Risk Solutions are hereby DISMISSED; and Defendants' request for costs and attorney fees' is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 09/16/2014. (CGP)
January 6, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses and Physical Medical Examination. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 01/06/2014. (NLT)
September 4, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 12 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge as the court's opinion herein. Because all of the named defendants are diverse from plaintiff, the plaintiff's 4 Motion to Remand is DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 09/03/2013. (CGP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Greyhound Lines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greyhound Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Paul J. Politz
Represented By: David Scott Rainwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLI Corporate Risk Solutions
Represented By: Paul J. Politz
Represented By: David Scott Rainwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FirstGroup America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward D Dixon
Represented By: D. Patrick Daniel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?