Sun Coast Contracting Services, LLC et al v. DQSI, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Sun Coast Contracting Services, LLC,
Defendant: DQSI, LLC and Western Surety Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00297
Filed: May 10, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270 Miller Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2016 175 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER that the Motion to Dismiss all Claims against Western Surety Company 92 filed by Defendant Western Surety Company, Inc. is DENIED. It is Ordered that the Motion to Dismiss 93 filed by Defendant DQSI, L.L.C. is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 02/04/2016. (ELW)
December 3, 2015 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: All parties and the bankruptcy trustee, or his attorney, Albert J. Derbes, IV, organize and participate in a telephone status conference at 11:00 a.m. on Thursday, December 17th, 2015, to inform the Court of the status of the bankruptcy truste e's review of the settlement agreement. The Clerk of Court shall email notice of this Order to Albert J. Derbes, IV, at ajdiv@derbeslaw.com and mail notice of the same to the following address: Albert J. Derbes, IV, The Derbes Law Firm, LLC, 3027 Ridgelake Drive, Metairie, LA 70002. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/3/2015. (BCL)
August 17, 2015 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The 141 Motion to Compel is GRANTED. The 142 Motion for Expedited Hearing is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 8/17/2015. (NLT)
July 16, 2015 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 133 Motion to Compel. The court will not order further responses to the Requests for Production. As written, they are improperly propounded by a non-party. Based on the circumstances, the court also finds that the award of expenses to either side would be unjust. The parties shall bear their own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 7/16/2015. (LLH)
June 19, 2015 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 113 Motion to Strike. The 110 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss is STRICKEN from the record. The 114 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum In Excess of Page Limitation is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 6/18/2015. (LLH)
December 17, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL RULING and ORDER: Plaintiff Sun Coast Contracting Services, LLC's Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 34) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, consistent with the rulings herein. FURTHER ORDERED that the Court's prior Ruling an d Order (Doc. 31), which granted summary judgment, is VACATED with respect to the two issues of (1) waiver and (2) unjust enrichment. The Court finds that Plaintiffs proffer of newly discovered evidence is not, in fact, "newly discovered&qu ot; and, therefore, such alleged evidence does not comprise any basis for the Court's reconsideration of its earlier ruling. FURTHER ORDERED that the matter is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for the issuance of a revised scheduling order. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/17/2014. (JDL)
October 22, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER: Defendants' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTION TO DISMISS (Doc. 27) are both GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs claims against Defendants DQSI, Western Surety, SCCS, and Hanover Insurance, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 10/21/2014. (JDL)
March 31, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting 8 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims against DQSI and Western Surety are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Defendants' request that costs be assigned to Plaintiff is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refile. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 03/31/2014. (CGP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sun Coast Contracting Services, LLC et al v. DQSI, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DQSI, LLC
Represented By: Adrian A. D'Arcy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company, Inc.
Represented By: Adrian A. D'Arcy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sun Coast Contracting Services, LLC,
Represented By: Luis Etienne Balart
Represented By: Carla T. Dillon
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?