Robinson v. City of St. Gabriel et al

Plaintiff: Chad Durrell Robinson
Defendant: Lionel Johnson, Jr, J. Darville, Kevin Ambeau, Sr., Robert Jones, Jr., S. Reddit and The City of St. Gabriel
Case Number: 3:2013cv00298
Filed: May 10, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting in part 23 Motion for Summary Judgment. All claims against all defendants are dismissed, except Plaintiff Chad Durrell Robinson's claims (1) against Officers Robert Jones, Jr. and Officer Justin Darville for ordin ary state law negligence for their alleged failure to protect Robinson's property and for their alleged infliction of emotional distress and (2) against the City of St. Gabriel for vicariously liable for that negligence. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/8/2014. (LLH)
March 25, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Police Chief Kevin Ambeau's MOTION TO DISMISS (Doc. 11) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs claims against Defendant Police Chief Kevin Ambea u, in his individual capacity only, are DISMISSED with prejudice. The Motion to Dismiss is DENIED on all other grounds. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/25/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PJH)
March 13, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting 10 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6). Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Mayor Lionel Johnson are DISMISSED, with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 03/12/2014. (CGP) Modified on 3/13/2014 to edit text (CGP).
March 3, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 14 Motion to Compel Discovery. Plaintiff shall serve his answers to interrogatories, and produce for inspection and copying all documents responsive to the defendants' requests for production, without objections, within 10 days. Pursuant to Rule 37(d)(3), the plaintiff is also ordered to pay to the defendants, within 10 days, reasonable expenses in the amount of $250. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 3/3/2014. (SMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. City of St. Gabriel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lionel Johnson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Darville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Ambeau, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Reddit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of St. Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Durrell Robinson
Represented By: Shannon Lasale Battiste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?