Varnado v. LeBlanc et al

Plaintiff: Hymel Varnado
Defendant: Burl Cain, Stephanie Lamartiniere, James LeBlanc and Kenneth Norris
Case Number: 3:2013cv00348
Filed: May 31, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 3, 2016 220 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint 198 is GRANTED filed by Hymel Varnado. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/03/2016. (ELW)
January 25, 2016 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 107 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The court allows consolidation for discovery, but DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE the portion of the Consolidation Motion asking for consolidation for trial. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 1/22/2016. (LLH)
February 20, 2015 91 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting the 89 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Defendant's 74 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in part, dismissing any claim made on behalf of other prisoners and any other claim asserted in his Complaint except for his deliberate medical indifference claim against the defendants based on the failure to timely provide him with hernia surgery, and denying the remainder of the defendant's motion. The Plaintiff's 81 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over any state law claims and these claims are dismissed without prejudice and this action is referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings on the plaintiff's Eighth Amendment deliberate medical indifference claim. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 2/20/2015. (LLH)
December 11, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 62 OBJECTION to Untimeliness and Validity of Responses to Request for Admissions and Interrogatories, MOTION to Strike, MOTION to Uphold FRCP Rules 33(b)(4) and 36(a)(3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/11/2014. (LLH)
March 6, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge's Report (Doc. 44) 1s ADOPTED as the Court's opinion herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Hymel Varnado's Order to Show Ca use for A[n] Injunction (sic) (Doc. 3) is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/6/2014. (PJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Varnado v. LeBlanc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Lamartiniere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hymel Varnado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?