Ashley v. Perry et al

Plaintiff: Gary Ashley
Defendant: Jason Perry and State of Louisiana
Case Number: 3:2013cv00354
Filed: June 4, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Richard L. Bourgeois
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2015 111 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 90 Motion for Summary Judgment. The motion is GRANTED with respect to Plaintiff's claims for compensatory damages under 42 U.S.C. § 1983. without prejudice to any state law claim. The motion is DENIED AS MOOT wit h respect to Plaintiff's state law claims in light of the Court's decision to decline exercise of supplemental jurisdiction. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. Plaintiff's claims for compensatory damages arising under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and Plaintiff's state law claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/15/2015. (LLH)
August 19, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss Complaint. The motion is DENIED on the basis of prescription. To the extent that Plaintiff Gary Ashley's complaint alleges claims against Defendant Jason Perry in his official capacity, such claims are DISMISSED. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/18/2014. (SMG)
August 6, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot 17 Motion to Dismiss. ; denying as moot 21 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 8/6/2103. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashley v. Perry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Ashley
Represented By: Donna Unkel Grodner
Represented By: Blake S. Leger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?