Kleinpeter et al v. Kilbourne et al

Plaintiff: Wade Esteve and Gabriel Kleinpeter
Defendant: Unknown Andyelle, Unknown Jackson, Tyrone Kilbourne, Unknown Landry, Unknown Northsworthy and Steven Radar
Case Number: 3:2013cv00357
Filed: June 4, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Shelly D. Dick
Referring Judge: Richard L. Bourgeois
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 24, 2015 104 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER: Defendants' 96 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by James Norsworthy, Tyrone Kilbourne, David Landry, and Kerrick Jackson is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Motion is granted in that the claims against Defendant James No rsworthy arising out of the October 28, 2012, incident are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, as Norsworthy is entitled to qualified immunity. Motion is granted in that the claims against Defendant James Norsworthy arising out of the December 2012 episode are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, as Plaintiff Kleinpeter has not exhausted his administrative remedies, but WITH PREJUDICE for the purposes of proceeding in forma pauperis on this claim. In all other respects, Defendants' motion is DENIED.. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 11/24/2015. (BCL)
January 26, 2015 92 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 88 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 38 Motion to Dismiss is granted and claims against Warden Steven Radar be DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 01/26/2015. (BCL)
October 17, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 68 Motion to Dismiss Sgt. Babington Anyaele under Rule 4(m). Additionally, Plaintiffs have 30 days from the date of this Order to perfect service on Sgt. Babington Anyaele. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 10/17/2014. (LLH)
May 16, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 37 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP Rule 4(m). Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 05/16/2014. (CGP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kleinpeter et al v. Kilbourne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Andyelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyrone Kilbourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Northsworthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Radar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade Esteve
Represented By: Donna Unkel Grodner
Represented By: Blake S. Leger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Kleinpeter
Represented By: Donna Unkel Grodner
Represented By: Blake S. Leger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?