Ball et al v. LeBlanc et al

Plaintiff: Elzie Ball, Nathaniel Code and James Magee
Defendant: Burl Cain, James M. LeBlanc, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections and Angie Norwood
Case Number: 3:2013cv00368
Filed: June 10, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2017 413 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The 410 Second MOTION to Maintain the Status Quo is DEFERRED, pending a report from the Special Master. The 411 Motion for Expedited Consideration of Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Maintain the Status Quo is GRANTED, and the 412 Motion for Leave toSupplement Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Maintain the Status Quo is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/5/2017. (LLH)
December 22, 2016 379 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 315 First MOTION to Modify Injunctive Relief. The Defendants are Enjoined to implement the remedial measures under the Third Plan during any period in which the heat index in the death-row tiers exceeds 88 degrees Fahrenheit "as stated herein". Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/22/2016. (EDC)
September 30, 2015 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Payment of Expert Fees (Doc. 146-1). The Court ASSESSES COSTS against Defendants in the amount of $1,939.50 in fees.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion f or Expedited Consideration of Motion to Compel Payment of Expert Fees (Doc. 204) is DISMISSED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/30/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PJH)
July 20, 2015 234 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 216 Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Attorney's Fees and Costs Regarding the Maintenance of the Status Quo. The Court ASSESSES COSTS against the Defendants in the amount of $15,019 in fees and $243.04 in costs. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 7/17/2015. (BCL)
June 3, 2014 175 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT granting 91 MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment and 174 MOTION and Incorporated Memorandum for Expedited Entry of Final Judgment. JUDGMENT is hereby rendered IN FAVOR of Plaintiffs Elzie Ball, Nathaniel Code, and James Magee and AGAINS T Defendants James M. LeBlanc, Nathan Burl Cain, Angelia Norwood, and the Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections as to Plaintiffs' claims under the Eighth Amendment to the United States Constitution. JUDGMENT is hereby rendered IN FAVOR of Defendants James M. LeBlanc, Nathan Burl Cain, Angelia Norwood, and the Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections and AGAINST Plaintiffs Elzie Ball, Nathaniel Code, and James Magee as to Plaintiffs' claims under Title II of the Americans with Disabilities Act, as modified by tbe Americans with Disabilities Act Amendment Act and Section 504 of the Rehabilitation Act of 1973. The parties shall file their motion for attorney's fees no later than 07/14/2014. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 06/02/2014. (NLT)
February 14, 2014 117 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 109 Motion for Guidance from the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 02/13/2014. (NLT)
January 17, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting 98 Motion for Expedited Consideration and denying 97 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 01/17/2014. (CGP)
December 19, 2013 88 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' Motions for Sanctions (Docs. 62, 63). Plaintiffs' Motions are GRANTED to the extent that they seek reimbursement of attorney's fees and costs. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' SHALL REIMBURSE Plaintiffs the full value of all attorney's fees and costs associated with the evidentiary and discovery violations described in this Order. Plaintiff's Motions are DENIED to the extent that they seek additional relief. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' shall file a motion for attorneys' fees and costs within 30 days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' coun sel E. WADE SHOWS, AMY L. MCINNIS, and JACQUELINE B. WILSON SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED against each personally, under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(c); M.D. La. LR83.2.4 and LR83.2.8; Louisiana Professional Conduct Rules related to candor to the tribunal and honesty and fair dealing to opposing counsel; and this Court's inherent powers. An order setting a date for a hearing on this Order to Show Cause shall follow. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/19/2013. (PJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ball et al v. LeBlanc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elzie Ball
Represented By: Elizabeth Claire O'K Compa
Represented By: Mitchell A. Kamin
Represented By: Jessica C. Kornberg
Represented By: Mercedes Hardy Montagnes
Represented By: Steven Robert Scheckman
Represented By: Nilay U. Vora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Code
Represented By: Elizabeth Claire O'K Compa
Represented By: Mitchell A. Kamin
Represented By: Jessica C. Kornberg
Represented By: Mercedes Hardy Montagnes
Represented By: Steven Robert Scheckman
Represented By: Nilay U. Vora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Magee
Represented By: Elizabeth Claire O'K Compa
Represented By: Mitchell A. Kamin
Represented By: Jessica C. Kornberg
Represented By: Mercedes Hardy Montagnes
Represented By: Steven Robert Scheckman
Represented By: Nilay U. Vora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Represented By: Judith R. E. Atkinson
Represented By: Thomas E. Balhoff
Represented By: Roedel, Parsons, Koch, Blache, Balhoff & McCollister
Represented By: Amy L. McInnis
Represented By: Edmond Wade Shows
Represented By: Jacqueline B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. LeBlanc
Represented By: Judith R. E. Atkinson
Represented By: Thomas E. Balhoff
Represented By: Roedel, Parsons, Koch, Blache, Balhoff & McCollister
Represented By: Amy L. McInnis
Represented By: Edmond Wade Shows
Represented By: Jacqueline B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections
Represented By: Judith R. E. Atkinson
Represented By: Thomas E. Balhoff
Represented By: Roedel, Parsons, Koch, Blache, Balhoff & McCollister
Represented By: Amy L. McInnis
Represented By: Edmond Wade Shows
Represented By: Jacqueline B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie Norwood
Represented By: Judith R. E. Atkinson
Represented By: Thomas E. Balhoff
Represented By: Roedel, Parsons, Koch, Blache, Balhoff & McCollister
Represented By: Amy L. McInnis
Represented By: Edmond Wade Shows
Represented By: Jacqueline B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?