Ariza v. Loomis Armored US, LLC

Plaintiff: Liza C Ariza
Defendant: Loomis Armored US, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv00419
Filed: June 28, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Shelly D. Dick
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2016 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the foregoing reasons and subject to the exceptions stated therein, this Court DENIES the Inference and Exhibits Motions, GRANTS the Bad Acts and Withdrawal Motions, and GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART the Defendant's Motion. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 01/22/2016. (BCL)
September 23, 2015 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 51 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 09/23/2015. (KDC)
September 8, 2015 118 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The 83 Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiff Liza C. Ariza For the Unauthorized Procurement of Documents From Loomis's Premises and Request for theCourt to Compel Plaintiff to Identify the Individual Who Conducted the Unauthorized Entry and At Whose Request is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/4/2015. (BCL)
July 9, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 07/09/2014. (NLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ariza v. Loomis Armored US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liza C Ariza
Represented By: Paul F. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loomis Armored US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?