Collier v. Roberts et al

Plaintiff: Angie Murphy Collier
Defendant: Sid J. Gautreaux, III, John Roberts and XYZ Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2013cv00425
Filed: July 1, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Shelly D. Dick
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 17, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 37 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 6/17/2016. (SGO)
March 11, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The official capacity claims brought against Sheriff Gautreaux are DISMISSED with prejudice. The official capacity claims brought against Deputy Roberts are DISMISSED with prejudice. The punitive damages claim against Sheriff Gautreaux in his official capacity is DISMISSED with prejudice. The motion is DENIED with respect to all individual capacity claims brought against Deputy Roberts, including the punitive damages claim as explained above. The motion is also DENIED as to the pending state law claims asserted. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 3/10/2015. (LLH) Modified on 3/12/2015 to edit doc type (LLH).
October 15, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 15 Motion to Stay. This matter is STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Either party may file a written motion to re-open this case within thirty (30) days of the final disposition of Plaintiff's outstanding criminal charges. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/15/2013. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collier v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angie Murphy Collier
Represented By: Michael Reese Davis, Sr.
Represented By: Tim P. Hartdegen
Represented By: L. J. Hymel, Jr.
Represented By: Hymel Davis & Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sid J. Gautreaux, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?