Nolan et al v. Exxon Mobil Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Lawrence J. Alexander, Flora H. Dupree, Joseph B. Eaglin, Mary T. George, Preston A. George, Sr., Gussie Johnson, Elnora Nolan, Tonga Nolan, Derrick D. Smith and Keisha L. Smith
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Catalyst Services, Inc., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Paul Leinweber, J. Derek Reese, Paul Stratford and Ryan Wong
Unknown: Ronald G. Franklin, Andrew G. Phillips, Lindsey Hargrove Raspino and Angela M. Spivey
Case Number: 3:2013cv00439
Filed: July 5, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2016 190 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The 167 Second Motion for Leave of Court to File Third Supplemental and Amending Complaint and the 166 Motion to Intervene are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/22/2016. (BLR)
May 13, 2015 159 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 124 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 5/13/2015. (LLH)
November 26, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 17 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/26/2013. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nolan et al v. Exxon Mobil Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence J. Alexander
Represented By: Ashley M. Liuzza
Represented By: Robert D. McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flora H. Dupree
Represented By: Ashley M. Liuzza
Represented By: Robert D. McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph B. Eaglin
Represented By: Ashley M. Liuzza
Represented By: Robert D. McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary T. George
Represented By: Ashley M. Liuzza
Represented By: Robert D. McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preston A. George, Sr.
Represented By: Ashley M. Liuzza
Represented By: Robert D. McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gussie Johnson
Represented By: Ashley M. Liuzza
Represented By: Robert D. McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elnora Nolan
Represented By: Ashley M. Liuzza
Represented By: Robert D. McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonga Nolan
Represented By: Ashley M. Liuzza
Represented By: Robert D. McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick D. Smith
Represented By: Ashley M. Liuzza
Represented By: Robert D. McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keisha L. Smith
Represented By: Ashley M. Liuzza
Represented By: Robert D. McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Megan E. Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExxonMobil Catalyst Services, Inc.
Represented By: Megan E. Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExxonMobil Oil Corporation
Represented By: Megan E. Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Leinweber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Derek Reese
Represented By: Megan E. Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Stratford
Represented By: Megan E. Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Ronald G. Franklin
Represented By: William D. Lampton
Represented By: James Conner Percy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Andrew G. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Lindsey Hargrove Raspino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Angela M. Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?