Garza et al v. Phillips 66 Company, et al

Plaintiff: Wayne Buckley, Charles Easterling, Manuel Garza, Steven Goode, Jerry Johnson, Larry Laborde, Lynn Laborde, James Little, Paul Luckey, Michael Northcutt, Larry A Smith, Donald Stephens and James Wells
Defendant: Chevron Phillips Chemical Company LP, Coastal Chemical Co., L.L.C., Diamond Offshore Company, ENSCO Offshore Company, Harbinger Group, Inc., Helmerich & Payne International Drilling Co., Kaneb Management Company, Montello, Inc., Nico Supply Co., Inc., Nustar Energy, Phillips 66 Company, Rowan Companies Inc and Union Carbide Corp.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00742
Filed: November 15, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Shelly D. Dick
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2016 100 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 99 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 75 Motion to Sever Plaintiffs Due to Misjoinder is DENIED. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 03/23/2016. (NLT)
July 18, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER: The 44 Motion to Compel Discovery filed by defendant Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP, is denied without prejudice. Furthermore, as provided by Rule 26(d)(1); IT IS ORDERED that the parties may commence discovery pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as of the date of this ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 7/17/2014. (NLT)
April 1, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING adopting the 38 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge as the Court's opinion herein and denying Plaintiffs' 20 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 4/1/2014. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garza et al v. Phillips 66 Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Buckley
Represented By: Philip R. Adams, Jr.
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Represented By: Jason Christian MacFetters
Represented By: Timothy Justin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Easterling
Represented By: Philip R. Adams, Jr.
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Represented By: Jason Christian MacFetters
Represented By: Timothy Justin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Garza
Represented By: Philip R. Adams, Jr.
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Represented By: Jason Christian MacFetters
Represented By: Timothy Justin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Goode
Represented By: Philip R. Adams, Jr.
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Represented By: Jason Christian MacFetters
Represented By: Timothy Justin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Johnson
Represented By: Philip R. Adams, Jr.
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Represented By: Jason Christian MacFetters
Represented By: Timothy Justin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Laborde
Represented By: Philip R. Adams, Jr.
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Represented By: Jason Christian MacFetters
Represented By: Timothy Justin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Laborde
Represented By: Philip R. Adams, Jr.
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Represented By: Jason Christian MacFetters
Represented By: Timothy Justin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Little
Represented By: Philip R. Adams, Jr.
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Represented By: Jason Christian MacFetters
Represented By: Timothy Justin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Luckey
Represented By: Philip R. Adams, Jr.
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Represented By: Jason Christian MacFetters
Represented By: Timothy Justin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Northcutt
Represented By: Philip R. Adams, Jr.
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Represented By: Jason Christian MacFetters
Represented By: Timothy Justin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry A Smith
Represented By: Philip R. Adams, Jr.
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Represented By: Jason Christian MacFetters
Represented By: Timothy Justin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Stephens
Represented By: Philip R. Adams, Jr.
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Represented By: Jason Christian MacFetters
Represented By: Timothy Justin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wells
Represented By: Philip R. Adams, Jr.
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Represented By: Jason Christian MacFetters
Represented By: Timothy Justin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Phillips Chemical Company LP
Represented By: Kathleen F. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Chemical Co., L.L.C.
Represented By: Caroline E Conway
Represented By: Frilot, Partridge, Kohnke & Clements, LC
Represented By: Campbell Edington Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Offshore Company
Represented By: Michael J. Vondenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENSCO Offshore Company
Represented By: Fowler, Rodriguez - NO
Represented By: Delos E. Flint, Jr.
Represented By: E. Stuart Ponder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbinger Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jacqueline M. Brettner
Represented By: Lindsay E. Spann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helmerich & Payne International Drilling Co.
Represented By: Mark John Spansel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaneb Management Company
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Sean T. McLaughlin
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Schlotterer
Represented By: Sarah K. Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montello, Inc.
Represented By: David Cartan Loker Gibbons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nico Supply Co., Inc.
Represented By: David Y. Lamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nustar Energy
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Sean T. McLaughlin
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Schlotterer
Represented By: Sarah K. Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips 66 Company
Represented By: Kathleen F. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowan Companies Inc
Represented By: Fowler, Rodriguez - NO
Represented By: Delos E. Flint, Jr.
Represented By: E. Stuart Ponder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corp.
Represented By: Michael H. Abraham
Represented By: Kuchler Polk Schell Weiner & Richeson, LLC
Represented By: Ernest G. Foundas
Represented By: Deborah Kuchler
Represented By: Perrey S. Lee
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?