Robinson v. Mitchell International, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Emathious Robinson
Defendant: Allen Krohn and Mitchell International, Inc.
Unknown: John Michael Kim and Molly Martha Weitzberg
Case Number: 3:2014cv00024
Filed: January 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Presiding Judge: Richard L. Bourgeois
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 RULING granting 61 and 63 Motions for Summary Judgment. The 64 Motion for Summary Judgment on Cross Claim is MOOT. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/1/2016. (LLH)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying 55 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 06/22/2015. (BCL)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RULING denying 18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) or, Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/16/2014. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Mitchell International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Krohn
Represented By: Stephen M. Pizzo
Represented By: Craig R. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell International, Inc.
Represented By: Noel Kelly Egnatios
Represented By: Brad Elliot Harrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: John Michael Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Molly Martha Weitzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emathious Robinson
Represented By: Jerrard Malvin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?