Hacker v. Cain et al
Plaintiff: Jason Hacker
Defendant: N. Burl Cain, Jason Collins, Stephanie Lamartiniere and Dr. Rahm Singh
Case Number: 3:2014cv00063
Filed: January 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Presiding Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 287 RULING granting 281 Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Certify that Plaintiff's Appeal is not Frivolous and REQUEST for a Trial Transcript at No Cost to Him. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 3/1/2017. (LLH)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 278 JUDGMENT is hereby rendered in favor of Louisiana Department Of Public Safety and Corrections, Louisiana State Penitentiary at Angola, State of Louisiana, James M. LeBlanc, John Bel Edwards, N. Burl Cain against Jason Hacker, dismissing this matter with prejudice. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 2/6/2017. (LLH)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 171 RULING AND ORDER denying 150 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony/Daubert Challenge, Edward C. Bell. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 7/5/2016. (LLH)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER denying 122 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 148 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 06/06/2016. (KDC)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 RULING granting 71 Motion to Determine the Sufficiency of Responses to Requests for Admissions. Plaintiff's Request for Admission Numbers 1 and 2 through 25, propounded as Plaintiff's First Request for Admissions Directed to Defendant James LeBlanc on 4/19/2015, are each deemed admitted under Rule 36(a)(6), Fed.R.Civ.P. Plaintiff is awarded reasonable expenses in the amount of $300, to be paid by the defendant within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/27/2015. (LLH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hacker v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Lamartiniere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Rahm Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?