McLean et al v. Big Dog Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: James Spencer McLean and Mary Madeline Hebert McLean
Defendant: Big Dog Group LLC, C. M. Field, TD Auto Finance and Ronald Todd Zeigler
Case Number: 3:2015cv00040
Filed: January 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: John W. deGravelles
Presiding Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 RULING AND ORDER: The 69 Motion to Set Aside Preliminary Default of Defendant, Big Dog Group, L.L.C. a/k/a AutoYes is GRANTED; and the Clerk's office is hereby directed to vacate and set aside the entry of default entered against AutoYes. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 4/14/2016. (LLH)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 RULING: The 45 Motion to Compel Answer of Defendant filed by the James Spencer McLean and Mary Madeline Hebert McLean is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 10/14/2015. (BCL)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 RULING granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion to File Amended Complaint. The clerk of court will file the Plaintiffs' Proposed Amended Complaint, which shall be considered as their first amended complaint. The motion is denied only i nsofar as the plaintiffs sought to amend the caption of the case. The 41 Motion to Amend Exhibits is granted. The clerk of court will add the exhibits submitted with the motion to the exhibits filed with Plaintiffs' Proposed Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs' 44 Motion to Strike Defendant Ronald Todd Zeiglers Defendant 42 Response is granted. The clerk of court will strike the Defendant Response filed 5/28/2015. Defendant Zeigler shall have 21 days to file an answer - titled as such - to the Plaintiffs' Proposed Amended Complaint, which answer must conform to the requirements of Rule 8, Fed.R.Civ.P.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/8/2015. (LLH)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER AND REASONS denying 6 Motion or Application for Stay of Proceedings Pending Arbitration without prejudice to the right of Autoyes to re-urge the motion after conducting discovery on whether Plaintiffs and Autoyes formed a valid agreement to arbitrate. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 4/14/2015. (SMG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLean et al v. Big Dog Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Dog Group LLC
Represented By: Suite B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. M. Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Auto Finance
Represented By: Edgar Stewart Spielman
Represented By: Stephen Paul Strohschein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Todd Zeigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Spencer McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Madeline Hebert McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?