Taylor v. The City of Baton Rouge et al
Plaintiff: Ernest Taylor
Defendant: Jeremiah A. Ardoin, Lea Anne Batson, Carl Dabadie, Jr., Jane Doe, John Doe #1 - #4, Lisa Freeman, Frank J. Gremillion, James L. Hilburn, Tedrick K. Knightshead, Mary E Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann, Kama Russell, Brett Delcambre, Karole Muller, Marlon Harris and Theodore Smith
Case Number: 3:2015cv00153
Filed: March 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER : This action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice and any claims remaining from 13-cv-579-BAJ-RLB, to the right, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reopen the action if the settlement is not consummated. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/6/2016. (LLH)
December 6, 2016 Filing 50 Minute Entry/ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.: Settlement Conference held on 12/6/2016. After a period of negotiations, the parties were able to reach an agreement as to the terms of a settlement, including claims remaining from 13-CV-579-BAJ-RLB. The court will enter a 60-day dismissal order. (LLH)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 12/6/2016 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/1/2016. (LLH)
October 26, 2016 Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. Telephone Conference held on 10/26/2016. Telephone Status Conference set for 1/11/2017 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. (ELW)
September 27, 2016 Filing 47 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.: Telephone Conference held on 9/27/2016. Parties discussed status of case and agreed that all deadlines are stayed until further order of the court. Telephone Conference set for 10/26/2016 at 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. (LLH)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #44 MOTION To Continue Suspension of Deadlines. All deadlines are STAYED until 10/3/2016. In addition, with consent of the District Judge, any briefing deadlines on any motions are likewise stayed. Telephone Conference set for 9/27/2016 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/15/2016. (LLH)
September 1, 2016 Filing 45 MOTION for Partial Dismissal by Lea Anne Batson, Carl Dabadie, Jr, Lisa Freeman, Frank J. Gremillion, James L. Hilburn, The City of Baton Rouge. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Brown, Gwendolyn)
August 31, 2016 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #44 MOTION To Continue Suspension of Deadlines . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
August 30, 2016 Filing 44 MOTION To Continue Suspension of Deadlines by All Plaintiffs. (Donahue, Terrence)
July 15, 2016 Filing 43 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.: Telephone Status Conference held on 7/15/2016. Defendants are GRANTED a 14-day extension until 7/29/2016 to respond to Plaintiff's written discovery requests. (SGO)
July 14, 2016 Filing 42 Notice to Counsel: Telephone Conference set for 7/15/2016 at 04:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Gwendolyn Brown shall initiate the conference call to chambers at (225) 389-3602. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(JSL)
June 30, 2016 Filing 41 ANSWER to #30 First Amended Complaint by Karole Muller.(Morris, Deelee) Modified to edit text on 7/1/2016 (SGO).
June 27, 2016 Filing 40 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint by Brett Delcambre, Marlon Harris, Kama Russell, Theodore Smith.(Morris, Deelee)
June 16, 2016 Set Deadlines in Accordance with record document 39: Discovery due by 8/19/2016. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 9/2/2016. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 9/30/2016. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 9/30/2016. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 10/28/2016. Discovery from Experts due by 11/25/2016. All other deadlines appearing in the original Scheduling Order (R. Doc. 25), including the deadline to file dispositive motions and Daubert motions by November 30, 2016, remain in effect. (ELW) Modified on 6/23/2016 to edit the text (NLT).
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 06/15/2016. (ELW)
June 15, 2016 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #38 Joint MOTION to Amend #25 Scheduling Conference, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines,,,,,,,, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
June 14, 2016 Filing 38 Joint MOTION to Amend #25 Scheduling Conference, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines,,,,,,,, by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Amended Scheduling Order)(Donahue, Terrence)
June 7, 2016 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ernest Taylor. Marlon Harris served on 6/4/2016, answer due 6/27/2016. (Attachments: #1 Attachment USPS Delivery Letter)(Donahue, Terrence)
June 3, 2016 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ernest Taylor. Brett Delcambre waiver sent on 5/6/2016, answer due 7/5/2016; Karole Muller waiver sent on 5/6/2016, answer due 7/5/2016; Kama Russell waiver sent on 5/6/2016, answer due 7/5/2016; Theodore Smith waiver sent on 5/6/2016, answer due 7/5/2016. (Donahue, Terrence)
April 13, 2016 Filing 35 Summons Issued as to Brett Delcambre. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (EDC)
April 11, 2016 Filing 34 Summons Submitted (Donahue, Terrence)
April 5, 2016 Filing 33 ANSWER to #30 First Amended Complaint by Jeremiah A. Ardoin, Lea Anne Batson, Carl Dabadie, Jr, Lisa Freeman, Frank J. Gremillion, James L. Hilburn, Tedrick K. Knightshead, Mary E Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann.(Gremillion, Frank) Modified on 4/6/2016 to edit text (LLH).
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Amended Complaint Jeremiah A. Ardoin Lea Anne Batson, Carl Dabadie, Jr., Lisa Freeman, Frank J. Gremillion, James L. Hilburn, Tedrick K. Knightshead, Mary E Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann answer due 4/5/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/23/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
March 21, 2016 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #30 Amended Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
March 18, 2016 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #30 Amended Complaint by Jeremiah A. Ardoin, Lea Anne Batson, Carl Dabadie, Jr, Lisa Freeman, Frank J. Gremillion, James L. Hilburn, Tedrick K. Knightshead, Mary E Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Brown, Gwendolyn)
March 8, 2016 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Request for Jury Trial against All Defendants, filed by Ernest Taylor.(ELW)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint (Doc. 26) is GRANTED. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint (Doc. 18) and Motion to Withdraw Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint (Doc. 24) are DENIED as moot. ORDERED that Defendants Omnibus Motion [Rule 12(g)] Motion to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Strike (Doc. 10) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 03/07/2016. (ELW)
March 7, 2016 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson: Telephone Conference held on 3/7/2016. Pending Motion to Amend the Complaint and Motion to Dismiss are discussed. Separate ruling shall be issued in accordingly. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PJH)
March 2, 2016 Filing 27 Notice to Counsel: Telephone Status Conference set for 3/7/2016 at 02:00 PM in chambers before Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the call to all Counsel and the Court. Evidence, in electronic format, shall be provided in accordance with Local Rule 79 and Administrative Procedures.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(PJH)
March 2, 2016 Motions No Longer Referred: #26 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USDJ. (PJH)
March 1, 2016 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #26 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
February 29, 2016 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; First Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Donahue, Terrence)
December 14, 2015 Filing 25 Minute Entry/ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 12/14/2015. Amended Pleadings due by 2/29/2016. Discovery due by 6/30/2016. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 1/19/2016. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 7/29/2016. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 8/31/2016. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 8/31/2016. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 9/30/2016. Discovery from Experts due by 10/31/2016. Motions shall be filed by 11/30/2016. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/22/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6 before Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 4/21/2017. Responses to Motions In Limine shall be filed by 5/12/2017. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 5/12/2017. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 6/23/2017. A 3 day Jury Trial set for 7/10/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson. (LLH)
October 30, 2015 Filing 24 MOTION to Withdraw #18 MOTION to Amend Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Donahue, Terrence)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Terrence J. Donahue, Jr. substituted as counsel of record for plaintiff replacing Christopher D. Glisson, Elliott C. Cassidy and Karl J. Koch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/23/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
October 23, 2015 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #22 MOTION to Substitute Terrence J. Donahue, Jr. in place of Christopher D. Glisson, Elliott C. Cassidy, and Karl J. Koch as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
October 22, 2015 Filing 22 MOTION to Substitute Counsel for Plaintiff by Ernest Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Koch, Karl) Modified on 10/23/2015 to edit text (ELW).
October 22, 2015 Filing 21 Notice to Counsel: Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2015 at 10:15 AM is RESET for 12/14/2015 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
October 22, 2015 Filing 20 STATUS REPORT by Ernest Taylor. (Koch, Karl)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The scheduling conference set for October 8, 2015 is hereby RESET for October 29, 2015 at 10:15 a.m. The joint status report is to be filed into the record no later than October 22, 2015. Furthermore, after reviewing the record, IT IS ORDERED that on or before October 23, 2015, plaintiff shall show cause, in writing, why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for plaintiff, Christopher D. Glisson, Elliott C. Cassidy and Karl J. Koch, for counsels' failure to file the status report as directed. If the status report is filed into the record by October 22, 2015, then no response is due from plaintiff to this order to show cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/6/2015. (BCL)
September 15, 2015 Motions No Longer Referred: #18 MOTION to Amend Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USDJ, per chambers request. (JDL)
September 9, 2015 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #18 MOTION to Amend Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
September 9, 2015 Filing 18 MOTION to Amend Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Koch, Karl)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 90 DAY CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/8/2015 at 10:15 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 10/1/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/8/2015. (JSL)
August 19, 2015 Filing 16 REPLY to #11 Memorandum in Opposition to #10 MOTION to Dismiss and Strike filed by Jeremiah A. Ardoin, Lea Anne Batson, Carl Dabadie, Jr., Lisa Freeman, Frank J. Gremillion, James L. Hilburn, Tedrick K. Knightshead, Mary E Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann. (BCL)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Permission to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/19/2015. (BCL)
August 14, 2015 Motions No Longer Referred: #14 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum In Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Strike . This motion is now pending before the USDJ. (JDL)
August 13, 2015 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #14 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum In Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Strike . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
August 12, 2015 Filing 14 MOTION for Permission to File Reply Memorandum by Jeremiah A. Ardoin, Lea Anne Batson, Carl Dabadie, Jr, Lisa Freeman, Frank J. Gremillion, James L. Hilburn, Tedrick K. Knightshead, Mary E Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Gremillion, Frank) Modified on 8/13/2015 to edit text (ELW).
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Substitute Corrected Version of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/11/2015. (BCL)
August 4, 2015 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Substitute Corrected Version of Plaintiff's #11 Opposition to #10 Motion to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Strike by Ernest Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Corrected Opposition, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Koch, Karl) Modified to edit text on 8/5/2015 (BCL).
August 3, 2015 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Alternative MOTION to Strike filed by Ernest Taylor. (Koch, Karl) Modified on 8/4/2015 to edit text (LLH).
July 13, 2015 Filing 10 RULE 12(g) OMNIBUS MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative MOTION to Strike by Jeremiah A. Ardoin, Lea Anne Batson, Carl Dabadie, Jr, Lisa Freeman, Frank J. Gremillion, James L. Hilburn, Tedrick K. Knightshead, Mary E Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann. (Attachments: #1 RULE 12(b)(6)MOTION to Dismiss, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Order, #4 RULE 12 (f)) MOTION to Strike, #5 Memorandum in Support, #6 Order)(LLH)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Permission to File Memoranda Exceeding Twenty Pages. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 7/10/2015. (LLH)
July 8, 2015 Filing 8 MOTION for Permission to File Memoranda Exceeding Twenty Pages by Jeremiah A. Ardoin, Lea Anne Batson, Carl Dabadie, Jr, Lisa Freeman, Frank J. Gremillion, James L. Hilburn, Tedrick K. Knightshead, Mary E Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment, #3 Proposed Pleading;, #4 Proposed Pleading;, #5 Memorandum in Support, #6 Attachment, #7 Proposed Pleading;, #8 Memorandum in Support, #9 Attachment)(Gremillion, Frank) Modified on 7/9/2015 to edit text(ELW).
April 23, 2015 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson: Status Conference held on 4/23/2015. Matter discussed. In light of agreements made in the related case of 13-cv-579-BAJ-RLB, the Court hereby EXTENDS the existing deadlines to file answer, outlined in Docket No. 4, by sixty (60) days. Accordingly, answers shall be due on July 14, 2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PJH)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting # 5 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Karl J. Koch and Elliott Cade Cassidy added for Ernest Taylor replacing Terrance Joseph Donahue, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 4/23/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SMG)
April 23, 2015 MOTION(S) REFERRED: # 5 MOTION to Substitute Karl J. Koch and Elliott Cassidy in place of Terrance Joseph Donahue, Jr. as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
April 22, 2015 Filing 5 MOTION to Substitute Karl J. Koch and Elliott Cassidy in place of Terrance Joseph Donahue, Jr. as Attorney by Ernest Taylor. (Glisson, Christopher)
April 9, 2015 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ernest Taylor. Jeremiah A. Ardoin waiver sent on 3/16/2015, answer due 5/15/2015; Lea Anne Batson waiver sent on 3/16/2015, answer due 5/15/2015; Carl Dabadie, Jr waiver sent on 3/16/2015, answer due 5/15/2015; Lisa Freeman waiver sent on 3/16/2015, answer due 5/15/2015; Frank J. Gremillion waiver sent on 3/16/2015, answer due 5/15/2015; James L. Hilburn waiver sent on 3/16/2015, answer due 5/15/2015; Tedrick K. Knightshead waiver sent on 3/16/2015, answer due 5/15/2015; Mary E Roper waiver sent on 3/16/2015, answer due 5/15/2015; The City of Baton Rouge waiver sent on 3/16/2015, answer due 5/15/2015; James Thomas waiver sent on 3/16/2015, answer due 5/15/2015; Patrick Wennemann waiver sent on 3/16/2015, answer due 5/15/2015. (Donahue, Terrence)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: This action appears to be related to Civil Action No. 13-579-BAJ-RLB,Ernest Taylor v. The City of Baton Rouge, et al. Civil Action No. 15-153-SDD-RLB is hereby transferred to Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson and Judge Shelly D. Dick on 03/18/2015. (BCL)
March 19, 2015 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson. Judge Shelly D. Dick no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BCL)
March 16, 2015 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jeremiah A. Ardoin, Lea Anne Batson, City of Baton Rouge, Carl Dabadie, Jr, Jane Doe, John Doe #1 - #4, Lisa Freeman, Frank J. Gremillion, James L. Hilburn, Tedrick K. Knightshead, Mary E Roper, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (BCL)
March 13, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeremiah A. Ardoin, Lea Anne Batson, City of Baton Rouge, Carl Dabadie, Jr, Jane Doe, John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, John Doe #4, Lisa Freeman, Frank J. Gremillion, James L. Hilburn, Tedrick K. Knightshead, Mary E Roper, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053N-1205485.), filed by Ernest Taylor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-F and Signature Page, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Donahue, Terrence) Modified to rotate pages on 3/16/2015 (BCL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. The City of Baton Rouge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Taylor
Represented By: Elliott Cade Cassidy
Represented By: Karl J. Koch
Represented By: Christopher D. Glisson
Represented By: Terrence J. Donahue, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremiah A. Ardoin
Represented By: Frank J. Gremillion
Represented By: Gwendolyn K. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lea Anne Batson
Represented By: Frank J. Gremillion
Represented By: Michael Paul Schillage
Represented By: Gwendolyn K. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Dabadie, Jr.
Represented By: Frank J. Gremillion
Represented By: Gwendolyn K. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1 - #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Freeman
Represented By: Frank J. Gremillion
Represented By: Arthur H. Andrews
Represented By: Gwendolyn K. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank J. Gremillion
Represented By: Frank J. Gremillion
Represented By: Gwendolyn K. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Hilburn
Represented By: Frank J. Gremillion
Represented By: Arlene C. Edwards
Represented By: Gwendolyn K. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tedrick K. Knightshead
Represented By: Frank J. Gremillion
Represented By: Jonathan Holloway, Sr
Represented By: Gwendolyn K. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary E Roper
Represented By: Frank J. Gremillion
Represented By: Arlene C. Edwards
Represented By: Gwendolyn K. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Baton Rouge
Represented By: Frank J. Gremillion
Represented By: Gwendolyn K. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Thomas
Represented By: Frank J. Gremillion
Represented By: Gwendolyn K. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Wennemann
Represented By: Frank J. Gremillion
Represented By: Gwendolyn K. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kama Russell
Represented By: Deelee S Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Delcambre
Represented By: Deelee S Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karole Muller
Represented By: Deelee S Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlon Harris
Represented By: Deelee S Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore Smith
Represented By: Deelee S Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?