Williams et al v. Innis Community Health Center, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Alfreda Williams and Peter Williams
Defendant: Innis Community Health Center, Inc. and The United States of America
Case Number: 3:2015cv00210
Filed: April 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Shelly D. Dick
Presiding Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402 Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RULING granting 44 Motion for Summary Judgment and the United States is dismissed from these proceedings without prejudice. Any response, shall be filed within fourteen (14) days and must be accompanied by an opposition memorandum to the original motion. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/28/2016. (LLH)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 RULING: The Court held Oral Argument on this motion on Tuesday, 4/19/2016. For the oral reasons assigned at this hearing, the Government's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff, Peter Williams, is ordered to fully and completely respond to each and every discovery request and Order of this Court on or before 5/19/2016, or he will be subject to the sanctions explained by the Court, including dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 4/20/2016. (LLH)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RULING: The defendant's 29 Motion to Compel Discovery is granted. Within 14 days plaintiff Peter Williams shall serve his answers to the defendant's interrogatories, produce all documents responsive to the defendant's request for pr oduction of documents, and complete, sign and return to counsel for the defendant the verification (or a declaration under oath), all without objections. Failure to comply with ruling may subject the plaintiff to sanctions, including dismissal of the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/14/2015. (BCL)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RULING: The Government's 13 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and Plaintiff, Alfreda Williams', claim is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 9/15/2015. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Innis Community Health Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innis Community Health Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfreda Williams
Represented By: David W. Ardoin
Represented By: Henry Carson McKowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Williams
Represented By: David W. Ardoin
Represented By: Henry Carson McKowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?