Delta Coatings, Inc. v. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Plaintiff: Delta Coatings, Inc.
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Case Number: 3:2015cv00222
Filed: April 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Presiding Judge: Richard L. Bourgeois
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 RULING AND ORDER granting 28 Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiffs claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 02/17/2017. (ELW)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RULING and ORDER Adopting 31 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge as the Court's opinion herein; denying 14 Motion to Remand . Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 01/17/2017. (EDC) Modified on 1/18/2017 to edit text. (EDC). Modified on 1/18/2017 to edit the text (NLT).
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 MOTION to Compel and to Extend Discovery Deadline for Limited Purposes If Necessary. The deadline to file all discovery motions and complete all discovery except experts is extended to 7/22/2016. Discover is closed with regard to plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 6/2/2016. (SGO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delta Coatings, Inc. v. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta Coatings, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Sterling Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Edward Louis Fenasci
Represented By: Kenneth Joseph Gelpi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?