Craig v. Bolner et al
Plaintiff: Candice Craig
Defendant: Anne Bolner and Louisiana Mental Health Advocacy Services
Case Number: 3:2015cv00815
Filed: December 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Shelly D. Dick
Presiding Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RULING AND ORDER granting 41 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's Motions for Extension of Time to Appeal (Docs. 47, 50, 53-57, 59-61) and the Motions to Seal (Docs. 48, 50-62) are DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 09/22/2017. (ELW)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Plaintiff's Emergency 18 Motion to Extend Time Limit for Service of Summons and Complaint (and Associated Status Report and Scheduling Conference) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff shall serve the defendants with proce ss within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Failure to serve the defendants by this deadline may result in the dismissal of Plaintiff's claims without further notice from the Court. Plaintiffs 19 Motion to Update Defendant Listin g (and Complaint) is GRANTED, and that document (R. Doc. 19) shall be entered into the record as Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's 20 Emergency Motion to Add Defendants to Civil Action is GRANTED, and that document (R. D oc. 20) shall be entered into the record as Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's 21 Emergency Motion to Amend 12/2/15 Petition (Complaint) and Include Said Document in Process of Service Issuance is GRANTED, and the Clerks Of fice shall enter Plaintiffs Fourth Amended Complaint (R. Doc. 21-1) into the record. Plaintiff's 22 Emergency Motion to Appoint Counsel and Extend Time Limit for Service of Summons and Complaint (And Associated Status Report and Scheduling Conference) is DENIED. Plaintiff's 23 (Motion for) Defendant Listing Update (R. Doc. 23) is GRANTED, and that document shall be entered into the record as Plaintiffs Fifth Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 5/27/2016. (LLH)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RULING denying 5 Motion to Seal Her Lawsuit. The Court further finds that Plaintiff's Motion requesting that all Court proceedings (e.g., hearings) be closed to the public is premature considering there have been no hearings scheduled to date in this matter. Therefore, Plaintiff's Motion shall be denied without prejudice, and she may re-urge her request should a hearing be scheduled before the Court in the future. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 1/20/2016. (JDL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craig v. Bolner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Bolner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Mental Health Advocacy Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candice Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?