Tassin v. Bob Barker Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert B Tassin, Jr
Defendant: Nancy Barker, Robert Barker, Bob Barker Company, Inc., Insurance Company and Subsidiaries
Case Number: 3:2016cv00382
Filed: June 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: John W. deGravelles
Presiding Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 OPINION Adopting 61 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Defendant's 55 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, and this action is dismissed with prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 9/23/2019. (KAH)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 OPINION Adopting 44 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge; granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. This matter is referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 2/13/2019. (SWE)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying 4 Motion Expedite an Order to Persevere Video of Accident. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 09/28/2017. (ELW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tassin v. Bob Barker Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Barker Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subsidiaries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert B Tassin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?