Thomas v. Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Inc.
Plaintiff: De'Marcus Thomas
Defendant: Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00572
Filed: August 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Presiding Judge: Richard L. Bourgeois
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 RULING AND ORDER granting 158 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Plaintiffs claims against Defendant D&A Enterprises, Inc. are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 6/2/2020. (KMW)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER denying 152 Motion to Compel Appearance of Plaintiff for Deposition in Louisiana. The parties shall make arrangements to conduct Plaintiff's deposition by telephone or video conference as set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/18/2020. (Bourgeois, Richard)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER denying 136 Motion for New Trial, Alteration or Amendment of Judgment, and Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/6/2019. (KAH)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 RULING and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 112 115 Motions for Partial Dismissal as follows: Thomas's collective-action claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; Thomas's fraud claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; Thomas's negligence claim against D&A Enterprises is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Motions (Docs. 112, 115) are otherwise DENIED. Granting 113 114 Motions to Strike. Thomas's class-action claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 6/25/2019. (EDC)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 RULING AND ORDER as to 91 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by D&A Enterprises, Inc.: Plaintiff De'Marcus Thomas is granted until 5/8/2019 to file a brief as written. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/6/2019. (LLH)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion for Partial Dismissal; granting 54 Motion to Strike. ORDERED that Thomas is granted 14 days to amend his complaint to attempt to plead (1) a collective-action claim under the FLSA; (2) a detrimental-reliance claim; and (3) a fraud claim. If Thomas fails to timely amend, the Court will, on its own motion, dismiss the claims with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 04/22/2019. (ELW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: De'Marcus Thomas
Represented By: Galen M Hair
Represented By: Christopher A Meeks
Represented By: David Paul Vicknair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Inc.
Represented By: Joelle Flannigan Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?