Roberts v. Vannoy et al

Plaintiff: Bryan Clayton Roberts
Defendant: Stephanie Lamartinere, Randy Lavespere, Jimmy Leblanc and Darrell Vannoy
Case Number: 3:2016cv00600
Filed: September 7, 2016
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: John W. deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion adopting 14 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge and dismissing this proceeding, without prejudice, for failure of Plaintiff to pay the initial partial filing fee ordered by the Court. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 9/11/17. (DCB) Modified on 9/11/2017 to edit text (DCB).
May 23, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 12 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 5/23/2017. (LLH)
October 18, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING : Finding no basis for the 6 Objection to Magistrate Judge's Ruling of 5 ORDER granting Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, the said order of the Magistrate Judge is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/18/2015. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Vannoy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Lamartinere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Lavespere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Leblanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Clayton Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?