Carter et al v. Cain et al
Plaintiff: Christa Carter, Irma Jean Carter and Unknown Does 1-5
Defendant: Barrett Boeker, Burl N. Cain, James Cruze, Jane Doe 10, Unknown Does 11-20, Unknown Does 21-30, Unknown Does 31-40, Unknown Does 41-60, Leslie Dupont, James M LeBlanc, Jonathon London, Fnu Manzina and Darrel Vannoy
Case Number: 3:2017cv00201
Filed: March 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Presiding Judge: Richard L. Bourgeois
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 RULING: The Defendant's 92] Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, and this matter shall be dismissed with prejudice. Any response to this Ruling, which should explain Plaintiffs failure to comply with the Courts deadlines, based on the appropriate Federal Rule of Civil Procedure, shall be filed within 14 days and must be accompanied by an opposition memorandum to the original Motion. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/14/2020. (KMW)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 RULING granting in part and denying in part 76 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. All claims against Defendants Kristen Thomas and Justine Worsham are hereby dismissed with prejudice, along with Plaintiffs deliberate medical indiffere nce and ADA/RA claims. Paragraphs 17, 18, 19, 20, 21, 22, 24, 26, 27, 28, 29, 30, 55, 56, 57, 58, 71, 72, 73, 77, 78, 142, 143, and 144 are hereby stricken from the Second Amended Complaint.Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 3/17/2020. (KMW)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RULING : Adopting 57 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Plaintiffs' Complaints are hereby DISMISSED against Defendant FNU Manzina, Assistant Warden, without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 41 (b)(1 )(A) for failure to serve and failure to prosecute. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 02/22/2019. (ELW)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 RULING granting in part and denying in part 48 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by James Cruze, Burl N. Cain, Barrett Boeker, Jonathon London, Darrel Vannoy, Leslie Dupont, James M LeBlanc. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 2/21/2019. (SWE)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RULING denying 24 Motion to Dismiss is hereby deniedwithout prejudice. If Plaintiffs comply with this Courts Ruling, the Defendants shall have 14 days to reurge their Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 03/13/2018. (ELW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter et al v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett Boeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl N. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cruze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Does 11-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Does 21-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Does 31-40
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Does 41-60
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Dupont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathon London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fnu Manzina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christa Carter
Represented By: Michelle Marie Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Jean Carter
Represented By: Michelle Marie Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unknown Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?