Cooper/T. Smith Stevedoring Company, Inc. et al v. Agribusiness United North America Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Cooper Consolidated, LLC and Cooper/T. Smith Stevedoring Company, Inc.
Defendant: Agribusiness United North America Corporation and M/V AEC DILIGENCE
Case Number: 3:2017cv00252
Filed: April 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RULING AND ORDER : Plaintiffs timely filed an Affidavit of Attorney's Fees and Costs, requesting $14,772.96. (Doc. 19 at p. 2). The Court awarded $400.00 in costs, but denied Plaintiffs' request for attorney's fees without p rejudice because Plaintiffs failed to adequately detail the specific fees requested. ORDERED that Plaintiffs' request for $1,670.00 in costs is DENIED, and Plaintiffs' request for $13,051.00 in attorney's fees is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 06/11/2018. (ELW)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER 19 Motion for Attorney Fees is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs may refile their request for attorney's fees within 21 days. Plaintiffs must detail the specific fees requested for each attorney, the number of hours each attorney worked, the hourly rate of each attorney, and detailed information about the experience of each attorney. ORDERED that the Court awards $400.00 in costs. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 05/16/2018. (ELW)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RULING granting 14 Motion for Default Judgment. Judgment shall be entered against Agribusiness United North America Corporation and the MN AEC Diligence. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 03/28/2018. (ELW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper/T. Smith Stevedoring Company, Inc. et al v. Agribusiness United North America Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agribusiness United North America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V AEC DILIGENCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cooper Consolidated, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Respess
Represented By: Galloway, Johnson, Tompkins, Burr & Smith- N.O.
Represented By: Jason P. Waguespack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cooper/T. Smith Stevedoring Company, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Respess
Represented By: Galloway, Johnson, Tompkins, Burr & Smith- N.O.
Represented By: Jason P. Waguespack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?