West v. Red Frog Events, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Vanessa West
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company, DEF Insurance Company, GHI Insurance Company, North South Renovations, Inc., Parish of West Feliciana, Peterson Builders Framing Contractors, LLC and Red Frog Events, LLC
ThirdParty Defendant: Marcus Edwards, Event Medical Staffing Solutions, LLC and Daniel L Lauber
Cross Defendant: North South Renovations, Inc., Peterson Builders Framing Contractors, LLC and Red Frog Events, LLC
Cross Claimant: Peterson Builders Framing Contractors, LLC and Red Frog Events, LLC
ThirdParty Plaintiff: Red Frog Events, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv01640
Filed: November 9, 2017
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2018 61 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER Adopting the 59 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case is REMANDED to the 20th JDC for the Parish of West Feliciana, State of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/13/2018. (LLH)
June 22, 2018 57 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE AND ORDER: as to 1 Notice of Removal, filed by Red Frog Events, LLC. Red Frog Events, LLC shall file a memorandum and supporting evidence concerning subject matter jurisdiction, specifically whether the amount in controversy requirem ent of 28 U.S.C. § 1332 is met, within ten (10) days of this Notice and Order. Plaintiff shall file either: (1) a memorandum and supporting evidence concerning the courts subject matter jurisdiction, specifically, whether the amount in cont roversy requirement of 28 U.S.C. § 1332 is met; or (2) a supplemental memorandum in support of the pending Motion to Remand, limited solely to the issue of amount in controversy, within ten (10) days after the filing of Red Frog Events, LLCs memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/22/2018. (LLH)
May 22, 2018 55 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER: The following Motions to Dismiss for Failure to Join are DENIED: Case No. 17-1146 (Doc. 16), Case No. 17-1147 (Doc. 24), Case No. 17-1402 (Doc. 34), Case No. 17-1640 (Doc. 9), Case No. 17-1664 (Doc. 15), Case No. 17-1670 (Doc. 6), Case No. 17-1671 (Doc. 6), Case No. 17-1686 (Doc. 8), Case No. 17-1704 (Doc. 8). Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/22/2018. (KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West v. Red Frog Events, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GHI Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North South Renovations, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Joseph Canizaro
Represented By: Andre' Collins Gaudin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parish of West Feliciana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peterson Builders Framing Contractors, LLC
Represented By: Robert E. Couhig, Jr.
Represented By: Cory Steven Grant
Represented By: Jonathan Percy Lemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Frog Events, LLC
Represented By: Christopher A. D'Amour
Represented By: Gerard Joseph Gaudet
Represented By: Adams and Reese LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Marcus Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Event Medical Staffing Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Daniel L Lauber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: North South Renovations, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Joseph Canizaro
Represented By: Andre' Collins Gaudin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Peterson Builders Framing Contractors, LLC
Represented By: Robert E. Couhig, Jr.
Represented By: Cory Steven Grant
Represented By: Jonathan Percy Lemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Red Frog Events, LLC
Represented By: Christopher A. D'Amour
Represented By: Gerard Joseph Gaudet
Represented By: Adams and Reese LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Peterson Builders Framing Contractors, LLC
Represented By: Robert E. Couhig, Jr.
Represented By: Cory Steven Grant
Represented By: Jonathan Percy Lemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Red Frog Events, LLC
Represented By: Christopher A. D'Amour
Represented By: Gerard Joseph Gaudet
Represented By: Adams and Reese LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: Red Frog Events, LLC
Represented By: Christopher A. D'Amour
Represented By: Gerard Joseph Gaudet
Represented By: Adams and Reese LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa West
Represented By: Julie-Ann A. Duhe-Keating
Represented By: Krystena L. Harper
Represented By: Amanda B. Rizzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?