Cabrero et al v. Brace Integrated Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Deborah Cabrero, Candida Rosa Echevarria, Nicaurys Duran Garcia, Alicia Morales, Maria A. Murillo, Reina Isabel Pavon, Miolanis Ferreira Reynoso and Andrea Mercedes Weddborn |
Defendant: |
Aptim Services, Inc. and Brace Integrated Services, Inc. |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv01698 |
Filed: |
November 27, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana |
Office: |
Baton Rouge Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Brian A. Jackson |
Presiding Judge: |
Erin Wilder-Doomes |
Nature of Suit: |
Labor: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 6, 2017 |
Filing
6
NOTICE AND ORDER: Aptim Maintenance, LLC shall shall have seven (7) days from the date of this Notice and Order to file a Motion to Substitute the 5 Amended Notice of Removal with a comprehensive, Amended Notice of Removal as written. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/6/2017. (LLH)
|
November 28, 2017 |
Filing
4
ORDER: Aptim Maintenance, LLC shall have seven (7) days from the date of this Notice and Order to file a comprehensive amended Notice of Removal. if the Plaintiffs agree with the allegations set forth in the Notice of Removal regarding Aptim Maintena nce, LLCs status, if the Plaintiffs agree with the allegations set forth in the Notice of Removal regarding Aptim Maintenance, LLCs status and must explicitly set forth the citizenship of each party. Amended Pleadings due by 12/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/28/2017. (ELW)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Cabrero et al v. Brace Integrated Services, Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Aptim Services, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Phyllis Guin Cancienne |
Represented By: |
Christopher G. Morris |
Represented By: |
Christopher Michael Vitenas |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Brace Integrated Services, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Peter S. Koeppel |
Represented By: |
Emma Alexandra Mekinda |
Represented By: |
Donesia D. Turner |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Deborah Cabrero |
Represented By: |
Jean-Paul Robert, Sr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Candida Rosa Echevarria |
Represented By: |
Jean-Paul Robert, Sr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Nicaurys Duran Garcia |
Represented By: |
Jean-Paul Robert, Sr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Alicia Morales |
Represented By: |
Jean-Paul Robert, Sr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Maria A. Murillo |
Represented By: |
Jean-Paul Robert, Sr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Reina Isabel Pavon |
Represented By: |
Jean-Paul Robert, Sr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Miolanis Ferreira Reynoso |
Represented By: |
Jean-Paul Robert, Sr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Andrea Mercedes Weddborn |
Represented By: |
Jean-Paul Robert, Sr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?